Global Patent Index - EP 1241399 A2

EP 1241399 A2 2002-09-18 - Optical system for stepped lens projector

Title (en)

Optical system for stepped lens projector

Title (de)

Optisches System für Stufenlinsenscheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Système optique pour projecteur avec une lentille à échelons

Publication

EP 1241399 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003626 A

Priority

DE 10113385 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2002324410A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide an improved optical system for Fresnel lens light, especially for spotlight or floodlight which maintains a uniformity of the light intensity on a lighting region and simultaneously improves the light efficiency. SOLUTION: The optical system for Fresnel lens is composed of an ellipsoidal reflector (1), a light source (2) and at least one Fresnel lens (3). The distance (a) between at least one Fresnel lens (3) and the ellipsoidal reflector (1) is related to the distance (b) between the light source (2) and the ellipsoidal reflector (1), and is determined by a predetermined caliber angle for the propagating light beam of the Fresnel lens light.

Abstract (de)

In der vorliegenden Erfindung wird ein optisches System für Stufenlinsenscheinwerfer beschrieben mit einem ellipsoiden Reflektor (1), einer Lampe (2) und mindestens einer Stufenlinse (3), wobei der Abstand (a) zwischen Stufenlinse (3) und Reflektor (1) zu dem Abstand (b) zwischen Lampe (2) und Reflektor (1) nach Maßgabe des einzustellenden Öffnungswinkels des aus dem Scheinwerfer austretenden Lichtbündels (4) in einer definierten Abhängigkeit steht. Der Abstand (b) wird dadurch eingestellt, dass die Lampe (2) zum Scheitelpunkt des Reflektors (1) hin oder vom Scheitelpunkt des Reflektors (1) weg bewegt wird. Bei dem optischen System besteht der Reflektor (1) aus einem metallischen oder transparenten Material. Mindestens eine der beiden Oberflächen des Reflektors (1) ist mit einem System dünner Schichten versehen. Das optische System wird in Scheinwerfern für Film, Bühne, Studio und Fotografie verwendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/00; F21V 5/02; F21V 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21S 10/00 (2006.01); F21V 5/02 (2006.01); F21V 13/00 (2006.01); F21V 14/02 (2006.01); F21V 5/04 (2006.01); F21V 7/22 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01); F21W 131/406 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 14/02 (2013.01); F21V 5/045 (2013.01); F21V 7/22 (2013.01); F21V 13/04 (2013.01); F21W 2131/406 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241399 A2 20020918; EP 1241399 A3 20050413; EP 1241399 B1 20080528; DE 10113385 C1 20020829; DE 50212306 D1 20080710; JP 2002324410 A 20021108; JP 2008288215 A 20081127; JP 4792486 B2 20111012; US 2003063466 A1 20030403; US 6899451 B2 20050531

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090303

2008-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212306 P 20080710

2008-06-25 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUER LIGHTING GMBH

2008-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 8/00 20060101AFI20071205BHEP

2008-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 14/02 20060101ALI20071205BHEP

2008-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 5/02 20060101ALI20071205BHEP

2008-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21W 131/406 20060101ALI20071205BHEP

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051104

2006-01-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT AG

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI