Global Patent Index - EP 1241407 A2

EP 1241407 A2 2002-09-18 - Device and method for preparing emulsions, in particular for preparing water-fuel emulsions

Title (en)

Device and method for preparing emulsions, in particular for preparing water-fuel emulsions

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Emulgation, insbesondere zur Emulgation von Wasser in einem Brennstoff

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé d' émulsification, notemment d' émulsification eau-carburant

Publication

EP 1241407 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005848 A

Priority

  • DE 10112627 A
  • DE 10133775 A
  • US 12194202 A

Abstract (en)

The device for the emulsifying especially of water in fuel has a rotor (2) double mounted in a stator. The width of the grinding gap formed between the rotor and stator is smaller than 30 microns. Self-lubricating ball bearings (15) are provided for the support of the rotor or shaft (1) carrying it. The device has at least one mechanical seal constructed in such a way that a spring pack provided in the rotating part of the mechanical seal does not lie in the stream of emulsified or to be emulsified fluids. An Independent claim is included for a procedure for the emulsifying of especially water in fuel using a rotor to swirl the fluid.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zur Emulgation, insbesondere zur Emulgation vo Wasser in einem Brennstoff, wird in einem Stator (3) ein drehbar doppelt gelagerter Rotor (2) angebracht. Bei dem entsprechenden Verfahren zur Emulgation wird die zu emulgierende Flüssigkeit von dem im Stator rotierenden Rotor verwirbelt, wobei der Rotor und der Stator einen Mahlspalt bilden, der kleiner als 30 µm ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23K 5/12; B01F 3/08; B01F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4142891 A1 19930701 - STACHE HEINO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK ES FI FR GR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241407 A2 20020918; EP 1241407 A3 20030226; US 2003193834 A1 20031016

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050514

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2004-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DK ES FI FR GR PT

2003-12-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-11-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI