Global Patent Index - EP 1241408 A1

EP 1241408 A1 2002-09-18 - Burner for an air-gas mixture

Title (en)

Burner for an air-gas mixture

Title (de)

Brenner für ein Brennstoffgemisch aus Luft und Gas

Title (fr)

Brûleur pour un mélange air-gaz

Publication

EP 1241408 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01129919 A

Priority

DE 10112669 A

Abstract (en)

The burner for an air and gas fuel mixture has a facility whereby exhaust gases (15) emerging from a heat exchanger (14) are gathered in an exhaust gas collector (17) and via a labyrinth (20) with guide plates (21,22) are fed to a downstream fan (30). The outlet (32) of the fan is connected to the exhaust gas duct (40). The exhaust gas collector has an inlet opening (18) which completely covers the outlet openings (16) of the heat exchanger and the cross sectionally reduced outlet opening (19) of the collector is connected to the inlet opening of the labyrinth.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Brenner für ein Brennstoffgemisch aus Luft und Gas, bei dem das Brennstoffgemisch mittels einer Armatur (11) einem in einer Brennkammer angeordneten Brennerelement (13) zuführbar ist und bei dem die bei der Verbrennung entstehenden Abgase über eine Wärmeübertrager (14), eine Abgaskammer und einer Abgasführung (40) ableitbar sind. Der Brenner kann trotz gebläsegeförderter Abführung des Abgases dann mit gleichmäßigem Flammbild und niedrigen Emissionswerten betrieben werden, wenn vorgesehen wird, dass die aus dem Wärmeübertrager (14) austretenden Abgase über einen Abgassammler (17) gesammelten und über ein Labyrinth (20) mit Leitblechen (21,22) geführt einem nachgeordneten Gebläse (30) zuführbar sind und dass der Ausgang (32) des Gebläses mit der Abgasführung (40) gekoppelt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/10 (2006.01); F23L 17/00 (2006.01); F23M 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23M 9/003 (2013.01); F23D 14/10 (2013.01); F23L 17/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241408 A1 20020918; EP 1241408 B1 20070912; DE 10112669 A1 20020926; DE 10112669 C2 20030703; DE 50112999 D1 20071025

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161215

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161215

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161215

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50112999

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080613

2008-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071107

2007-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50112999 P 20071025

2007-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI