Global Patent Index - EP 1241415 A2

EP 1241415 A2 2002-09-18 - Radiator with central valve arrangement

Title (en)

Radiator with central valve arrangement

Title (de)

Heizkörper mit einer mittig angeordneten Ventilgarnitur

Title (fr)

Radiateur avec assemblage de valve centrale

Publication

EP 1241415 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02090034 A

Priority

DE 10113125 A

Abstract (en)

The radiator comprises a flow connection (5) which is connected at the centre to the longitudinal channel of the front panel (2). Also, a return connection (6) is connected at the centre to the longitudinal channel of the back panel (3) of the radiator. A pipe set (12,13) is arranged between the front and back panels, in the area of the front of the radiator. The pipe set connects the bottom longitudinal channel (2.2) of the front panel to the top longitudinal channel (3.1) of the back panel.

Abstract (de)

Heizkörper, bestehend aus mindestens zwei Einzelplatten (2, 3) mit einer mittig angeordneten Verteilergarnitur (4) zum Anschluss des Heizkörpers (1) an eine Vor- und eine Rücklaufleitung (5, 6) eines Heizkreislaufes, wobei der Vorlaufanschluss (5) mittig mit einem Längskanal der vorderen Platte (2), und der Rücklaufanschluss (6) mittig mit einem Längskanal einer hinteren Platte (3) verbunden ist und zwischen der vorderen Platte (2) und einer dahinterliegenden Platte (3) im Bereich der Stirnseiten je eine Rohrgarnitur (12, 13) angeordnet ist, die jeweils den unteren Längskanal (2.2) der vorderen Platte (2) mit dem oberen Längskanal (3.1) der hinteren Platte (3) verbindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0002 (2013.01); F24D 19/0036 (2013.01); F24D 19/0043 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241415 A2 20020918; EP 1241415 A3 20031008; EP 1241415 B1 20061004; AT 341741 T 20061015; CZ 20020397 A3 20021113; CZ 300414 B6 20090513; DE 10113125 A1 20020919; DE 50208302 D1 20061116; PL 204082 B1 20091231; PL 352423 A1 20020923

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208302 P 20061116

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI