Global Patent Index - EP 1241422 A2

EP 1241422 A2 2002-09-18 - Material feeding mechanism in association with continuous sintering apparatus

Title (en)

Material feeding mechanism in association with continuous sintering apparatus

Title (de)

Materialzufuhreinrichtung und entsprechende kontinuierliche Sinteranlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation de matériaux associé à un appareil de frittage en continu

Publication

EP 1241422 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01307825 A

Priority

JP 2001071701 A

Abstract (en)

In a material feeding mechanism in association with a continuous sintering apparatus, a material (S) carried by a transporting conveyer (1) into an atmosphere-displacement chamber (2) is fed into a furnace casing (4) of the continuous sintering apparatus by using a loading pusher (3). The transporting conveyor (1), the atmosphere-displacement chamber, and the loading pusher (3) are arranged in such a manner that a direction in which the material is carried by the transporting conveyor and a direction in which the material is fed from the atmosphere-displacement chamber into the furnace casing by the loading pusher are linearly aligned, and the loading pusher and a drive unit (3a) thereof are installed under a floor of the atmosphere-displacement chamber (2) so that the loading pusher moves up over the floor surface of the atmosphere-displacement chamber and moves forward and backward on the floor surface of the atmosphere-displacement chamber when the material is fed into the furnace casing (4). By such a construction, the longitudinal dimension of the continuous sintering apparatus can be made as short as possible to realize a compact design as a whole. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 21/00; F27B 9/04; F27D 3/00; F27D 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21C 21/02 (2006.01); F27B 21/06 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01); F27D 3/04 (2006.01); F27D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 3/00 (2013.01); F27B 21/06 (2013.01); F27D 3/04 (2013.01); F27D 2003/0042 (2013.01); F27D 2003/124 (2013.01); F27M 2001/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241422 A2 20020918; EP 1241422 A3 20031126; EP 1241422 B1 20041124; DE 60107379 D1 20041230; DE 60107379 T2 20050512; JP 2002267372 A 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60107379

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JAPAN *NUCLEAR CYCLE DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090917

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090909

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107379 P 20041230

2004-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 27B 21/00 A

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 27D 3/00 B

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 27D 3/04 B

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 27B 9/04 B

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI