Global Patent Index - EP 1241435 A1

EP 1241435 A1 2002-09-18 - Projectile and manufacturing method therefor

Title (en)

Projectile and manufacturing method therefor

Title (de)

Projektil und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Projectile et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1241435 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02002216 A

Priority

CH 4722001 A

Abstract (en)

A projectile comprises a mantle (14), a projectile base (12) which closes the rear of the mantle, a spool (16) for receiving electromagnetic signals, an energy source (22) and a logic module (23). At least the rear of the mantle is made of plastic.

Abstract (de)

Projektil (10.1, 10.2, 10.3) mit einem Mantel (14), einem Projektilboden (12), welcher den Mantel (14) hinten abschliesst, einer Empfangsspule (16) zum Empfangen von elektromagnetischen Signalen, einer mit der Empfangsspule (16) kontaktierten Energiequelle (22) und einem Logikmodul (23). Der Mantel (14) ist mindestens im Bereich des Hecks aus einem Kunststoff hergestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/76; F42C 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/11 (2006.01); F42B 8/14 (2006.01); F42B 12/22 (2006.01); F42B 12/76 (2006.01); F42B 30/00 (2006.01); F42C 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 30/006 (2013.01); F42B 12/76 (2013.01); F42C 19/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241435 A1 20020918; EP 1241435 B1 20070117; AT 352023 T 20070215; CA 2369708 A1 20020914; CA 2369708 C 20060321; DE 50209260 D1 20070308; ES 2280440 T3 20070916; JP 2002318099 A 20021031; JP 4028741 B2 20071226; NO 20020520 A 20020916; NO 20020520 D0 20020201; NO 327204 B1 20090511; SG 118113 A1 20060127; US 2002129727 A1 20020919; US 2007017404 A1 20070125; US 6874402 B2 20050405; US 7197981 B2 20070403; ZA 200200942 B 20020814

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070130

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070130

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: RWM SCHWEIZ A.G.

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-12-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071018

2007-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2280440 T3

2007-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-06-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070618

2007-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070401010

2007-04-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070417

2007-04-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2007-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209260 P 20070308

2007-03-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070214

2007-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-01-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2007-01-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2007-01-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2007-01-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2006-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RWM SCHWEIZ AG

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI