Global Patent Index - EP 1241527 A1

EP 1241527 A1 2002-09-18 - POSITIVE TYPE PHOTOSENSITIVE POLYIMIDE RESIN COMPOSITION

Title (en)

POSITIVE TYPE PHOTOSENSITIVE POLYIMIDE RESIN COMPOSITION

Title (de)

POSITIV ARBEITENDE PHOTOEMPFINDLICHE POLYIMIDHARZ-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE RESINE DE POLYIMIDE PHOTOSENSIBLE DE TYPE POSITIF

Publication

EP 1241527 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00977917 A

Priority

  • JP 0008296 W
  • JP 33951899 A

Abstract (en)

A positive type photosensitive resin composition which can be developed by an aqueous alkaline solution and which is excellent in the developability and the adhesion to a substrate, is presented. Namely, the present invention presents a positive type photosensitive polyimide resin composition characterized by comprising 100 parts by weight of a solvent-soluble polyimide having repeating units represented by the formula (1) and from 1 to 50 parts by weight of a polyimide precursor having repeating units represented by the formula (2), and by further containing an o-quinonediazide compound in an amount of from 1 to 100 parts by weight per 100 parts by weight of the total amount of the repeating units represented by the formula (1) and the repeating units represented by the formula (2): <CHEM> <CHEM> (wherein R<1> and R<3> are bivalent organic groups, from 1 to 90 mol% of R<1> is a bivalent organic group having one or plural groups of at least one type selected from the group consisting of a phenolic hydroxyl group, a carboxyl group, a thiophenol group and a sulfonic group, and from 10 to 99 mol% is a bivalent organic group having no phenolic hydroxyl, carboxylic, thiophenol or sulfonic group, and R<2> and R<4> are tetravalent organic groups constituting a tetracarboxylic acid or its derivative).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03F 7/023; C08K 5/28; C08L 79/08; G03F 7/038; H01L 21/027

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/20 (2006.01); C08K 5/28 (2006.01); C08L 79/08 (2006.01); G03F 7/023 (2006.01); H01L 21/312 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/312 (2013.01); C08K 5/20 (2013.01); C08K 5/28 (2013.01); C08L 79/08 (2013.01); G03F 7/0233 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08K 5/20 + C08L 79/08
  2. C08K 5/28 + C08L 79/08
  3. C08L 79/08 + C08L 79/08

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241527 A1 20020918; EP 1241527 A4 20030115; CN 1208683 C 20050629; CN 1402841 A 20030312; KR 100732895 B1 20070627; KR 20030009327 A 20030129; TW I254833 B 20060511; US 6677099 B1 20040113; WO 0140873 A1 20010607

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060322

2005-12-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB LI NL

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-01-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021128

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03F 7/00 A, 7C 08K 5/28 B, 7C 08L 79/08 B

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR