Global Patent Index - EP 1241540 A1

EP 1241540 A1 2002-09-18 - Device for fastening a bracelet to a watch-case

Title (en)

Device for fastening a bracelet to a watch-case

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Armbandes an einem Uhrengehäuse

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un bracelet sur une boîte de montre

Publication

EP 1241540 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01106018 A

Priority

EP 01106018 A

Abstract (en)

Has a U shaped grip (24) whose flexible sides support studs (25) which fit into holes (22) to counteract against push studs (21). The studs (21) slide in ferrules (19) formed in slots (17) in feet (15). The studs (21) are pressed against the ferrule (19) by elastic pressure from the U shaped grip. The inner face of the foot (15) has, aligned on the longitudinal axis of the slots (17), guide grooves (23) whose width corresponds to the diameter of pivots (8,9). Fixing for a watch bracelet onto a watch casing. Has a hinge (1) forming part of the casing (2) in which slides two pivots (8,9) under the action of a spring (10) tending to keep them apart so that the external ends of the pivots emerge from the lateral faces of the hinge. A fixing part (3) is designed to be fitted at the end of a bracelet having two feet (15) defining a space into which the hinge fits. Each of the feet has an axial slot (17) extended by a passage (18) ending in the space between the feet and having a diameter corresponding to that of the pivot ends (8,9). The slot is connected to the two external lateral faces of the feet by a hole (22) of smaller diameter than the slot (17). Push studs (22), sliding in the slot, have an inner end whose diameter corresponds to that of the passage (18).

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif de fixation d'un bracelet de montre sur une boîte de montre comporte un gond (1) solidaire de la boîte de montre (2) dans lequel coulissent deux pivots (8, 9) et un élément de fixation (3) destiné à être fixé à l'extrémité d'un bracelet muni de deux pattes (15) définissant entre elles un espace destiné à recevoir le gond (1). Chacune de ces pattes comportent un évidement axial prolongé par un passage débouchant dans l'espace compris entre ces pattes (15) et présentant un diamètre correspondant à celui des extrémités des pivots (8, 9). Cet évidement est relié aux faces latérales externes des pattes par un orifice (22) de plus petit diamètre que l'évidement et des contre-poussoirs (21) coulissent dans cet évidement. Il comporte encore une pince (24) en forme de U dont les branches élastiques comportent des ergots (25) pouvant s'engager dans les orifices (22) pour agir sur les contre-poussoirs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 37/16; G04D 1/00; G04D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/14 (2006.01); G04D 1/00 (2006.01); G04D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04D 1/0042 (2013.01); G04B 37/1493 (2013.01); G04D 3/0066 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

CH 662028 A 19870915

Citation (search report)

[A] CH 662028 A 19870915

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241540 A1 20020918; EP 1241540 B1 20081210

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2015-12-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CARTIER INTERNATIONAL AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CARTIER CREATION STUDIO S.A., CH

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090911

2008-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE SA

2008-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2007-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071126

2007-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARTIER CREATION STUDIO S.A.

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI