Global Patent Index - EP 1241542 A1

EP 1241542 A1 2002-09-18 - Watch-case for a wristwatch or a pocket watch

Title (en)

Watch-case for a wristwatch or a pocket watch

Title (de)

Uhrengehäuse für eine Armband- oder Taschenuhr

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour montre-bracelet ou montre de poche

Publication

EP 1241542 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01810259 A

Priority

EP 01810259 A

Abstract (en)

Housing for a wrist or pocket watch comprises a housing ring (1) and a glass face (2) with a detachable housing bottom (3). A fastening ring (4) is detachably attached to the housing bottom and surrounds and holds the housing ring to the housing bottom. Both rings extend to the housing bottom to form a sealed connection with it.

Abstract (de)

Das Uhrengehäuse für eine Armband- oder Taschenuhr enthält einen Gehäusering (1), ein mit dem Gehäusering (1) verbundenes Glas (2) und einen mit dem Gehäusering (1) lösbar verbundenen Gehäuseboden (3). Wenn der Gehäusering (1) aus einem sehr harten Material wie polykristallinem Saphir oder Diamant besteht, kann er praktisch nur durch Schleifen bearbeitet werden und es ist schwierig, ihn mit Gewinden zur Befestigung des Gehäusebodens (3) auszustatten. Ein Haltering (4), der mit dem Gehäuseboden (3) lösbar verbunden ist, umgibt den Gehäusering (1) und hält diesen am Gehäuseboden fest. Der Haltering (4) und der Gehäusering (1) sind an den einander zugewandten Flächen zum Gehäuseboden (3) hin erweitert, wodurch eine formschlüssige Verbindung entsteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 37/18; G04B 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/00 (2006.01); G04B 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/0008 (2013.01); G04B 37/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

CH 647376 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241542 A1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2007-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070417

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VACUUM CHRONOMETER CORPORATION

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI