Global Patent Index - EP 1241550 A9

EP 1241550 A9 2002-11-20 - Enhancement to horizontally-structured CAD/CAM modeling

Title (en)

Enhancement to horizontally-structured CAD/CAM modeling

Title (de)

Verbesserung zum horizontal structurierten CAD/CAM Modellieren

Title (fr)

Amélioration de la modélisation CAD/CAM à structure horizontale

Publication

EP 1241550 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 02075776 A

Priority

  • US 27625501 P
  • US 3296001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1241550A2] Disclosed herein is a method of horizontally structured CAD/CAM modeling, comprising: establishing a coordinate system (6); adding a base feature (0); adding a form feature (5a - 5g); where the form feature (5a - 5g) exhibits an associative relationship with the coordinate system (6). Also disclosed herein is a horizontally structured CAD/CAM model, comprising: a coordinate system (6); a base feature (0); a form feature (5a - 5g); where the form feature (5a - 5g) exhibits an associative relationship with the coordinate system (6). Further disclosed is a storage medium encoded with a machine-readable computer program code for horizontally structured CAD/CAM modeling. The storage medium including instructions for causing a computer to implement the method of horizontally structured CAD/CAM modeling and manufacturing. Additionally disclosed is a computer data signal for horizontally structured CAD/CAM modeling. The computer data signal comprising code configured to cause a processor to implement a method of horizontally structured CAD/CAM modeling and manufacturing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05B 19/4097

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/4097 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/4097 (2013.01); Y02P 90/265 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241550 A2 20020918; EP 1241550 A3 20090429; EP 1241550 A9 20021120; US 2002133803 A1 20020919; US 7308386 B2 20071211

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130903

2012-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEERING SOLUTIONS IP HOLDING CORPORATION

2012-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC

2011-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC

2011-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC.

2010-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100308

2010-01-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091027

2009-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI