Global Patent Index - EP 1241650 A1

EP 1241650 A1 2002-09-18 - Mobile terminal for use in a vehicle navigation system

Title (en)

Mobile terminal for use in a vehicle navigation system

Title (de)

Mobiles Endgerät zur Verwendung in einem Fahrzeug-Navigationssystem

Title (fr)

Terminal mobile à l'emploi dans un système de navigation d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1241650 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01106581 A

Priority

EP 01106581 A

Abstract (en)

Method and apparatus for vehicle navigation for informing a driver about driving conditions ahead of the vehicle, comprising a positioning means (16) to locate the position of the vehicle, and a data processing device (12) adapted to process data and to interact with the driver (14), said data processing device (12) being connected to said positioning means (16), characterised by a wireless application protocol (WAP) transceiving means (10) connected to the data processing device (12) and adapted to exchange route related data with a service provider (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0968; G08G 1/127

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/123 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241650 A1 20020918; EP 1241650 B1 20040512; DE 60103245 D1 20040617; DE 60103245 T2 20050630

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090315

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090315

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60103245 P 20040617

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI