Global Patent Index - EP 1241653 A2

EP 1241653 A2 2002-09-18 - Labelband

Title (en)

Labelband

Title (de)

Etikettenbahn

Title (fr)

Bande à étiquettes

Publication

EP 1241653 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004704 A

Priority

DE 20104453 U

Abstract (en)

The sticker backing material (10) is fixed non-permanently via a fixing adhesive layer (16) to a first sticker (14). On the backing material is information and a second sticker (22) which has perforations for removal from the first sticker. Weak points divide the stickers from one another and allow removal. Gripping strips (26,28) allow for easy removal of the stickers from the backing material. On printing of information on the sticker a film is deactivated allowing for their removal.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um eine Etikettenbahn mit einem Trägermaterial (10), auf welchem mittels einer Haftkleberschicht (16) ein erstes Etikett (14) lösbar befestigt ist, auf dessen vom Trägermaterial (10) abgewandten Seite Information (20) aufgedruckt ist, und mit einem zweiten Etikett (22), welches hinsichtlich seiner Umrissform mit dem ersten Etikett (14) identisch ausgebildet und passergenau auf dem ersten Etikett (14) angeordnet ist. Im zweiten Etikett (22) sind im Abstand voneinander zwei Schwächungslinien (31, 32) vorgesehen, welche zwischen sich einen abziehbaren Abschnitt (34) definieren, der mindestens einen Teil der auf das erste Etikett (14) aufgedruckten Information (20) überdeckt, mittels eines lösbaren Haftklebers (24) auf dem ersten Etikett (14) befestigt und von diesem abziehbar ist, um mindestens einen Teil der aufgedruckten Information (20) des ersten Etiketts (14) sichtbar zu machen. Der abziehbare Abschnitt (34) ist mit mindestens einer Grifflasche (26, 28) versehen, in deren Bereich entweder kein Haftkleber vorgesehen oder ein dort vorgesehener Haftkleber (24) deaktiviert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02; G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01); G09F 3/0288 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20202052 U1 20020725; EP 1241653 A2 20020918; EP 1241653 A3 20070425

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101001

2008-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-08-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070628

2007-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI