Global Patent Index - EP 1241691 A2

EP 1241691 A2 2002-09-18 - Snap switch mechanism for an actuator

Title (en)

Snap switch mechanism for an actuator

Title (de)

Sprungschaltwerk für einen Aktuator

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de commutation à action brusque pour un actionneur

Publication

EP 1241691 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005968 A

Priority

DE 10113009 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a movable part (5) and at least one spring (3) that holds the movable part of the actuator in two stationary end positions (12) and has a dead point. The spring provides a central position (18) for the movable part between the end points and is designed so that bending the spring causes dead point to be reached before reaching the central position of the movable part.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Sprungschaltwerk nach dem Stand der Technik kommt es beim Umschalten zu Problemen, weil im Bereich des Totpunkts einer Feder die antreibende Kraft nahezu null ist. Ein erfindungsgemäss ausgebildetes Sprungschaltwerk (1) hat eine Feder (3), die so ausgebildet ist, dass sie ihren Totpunkt vor einer Mittellage des beweglichen Teils (5) erreicht, wodurch ein sicheres Umklappen in eine andere stabile Endlage (10,12) möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241691 A2 20020918; EP 1241691 A3 20040506; DE 10113009 A1 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041109

2005-03-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-01-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI