Global Patent Index - EP 1241729 A1

EP 1241729 A1 2002-09-18 - Dielectric filter and method of manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Dielectric filter and method of manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Dielektrisches Filter und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Filtre diélectrique et sa méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1241729 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01106723 A

Priority

EP 01106723 A

Abstract (en)

A plurality of resonators 50 are formed in a dielectric porcelain block 42, wherein each of the resonators 50 is formed by coating an interior surface of a through section with an interior conductor 54, thus constituting a dielectric filter 41. On a side surface 44 of the dielectricblock 42 perpendicular to an open end face 43 having the through sections formed therein, there are formed protrusions 45 having a height L lower than that of the through sections. Terminal electrodes 60a and 60b are defined with the protrusions 45 taken as a boundary between the terminal electrodes 60a and 60b, and isolated from an exterior conductor 62. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/205

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/205 (2006.01); H01P 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/2056 (2013.01); H01P 11/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241729 A1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071130

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI