Global Patent Index - EP 1241741 A1

EP 1241741 A1 2002-09-18 - Elecrical apparatus, specially multiple socket, for the installation into a mounting hole of a cable conduct

Title (en)

Elecrical apparatus, specially multiple socket, for the installation into a mounting hole of a cable conduct

Title (de)

Elektrisches Installationsgerät, insbesondere Mehrfach-Steckdose, zum Einsetzen in eine Einbauöffnung eines Kabelkanals

Title (fr)

Appareil électrique, spécialement multiprise, pour le montage dans une ouverture d'un conduit de câble

Publication

EP 1241741 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01105429 A

Priority

EP 01105429 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a housing (2) and an attachment yoke (3) sprung transversely to a longitudinal axis through the housing and to an insertion direction. The attachment yoke deforms elastically from a base position when inserted into a cable channel (1) opening and then returns elastically to its former shape to be fixed by force and/or shape locking.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein ein Gehäuse (2) aufweisendens elektrisches Installationsgerät, insbesondere eine Mehrfach-Steckdose, zum Einsetzen in eine Einbauöffnung (1a) eines Kabelkanals (1). Um ein solches Gerät derart zu auszugestalten, daß bei einem weiten möglichen Einsatzspektrum hinsichtlich der das Installationsgerät aufnehmenden Kanäle eine einfache, aber zuverlässige Montage gewährleistet werden kann, sind am Gehäuse (2) befestigbare, quer zu einer durch das Gehäuse (2) verlaufenden Längsachse und quer zu einer Richtung (E) des Einsetzens federbare Befestigungsbügel (3) vorgesehen. Diese sind derart ausgebildet, daß sie beim Einsetzen unter elastischer Verformung aus einer unverformten Grundposition heraus nach innen, auf die Längsachse zu, in die Einbauöffnung (1a) einsteckbar und darin nach einer elastischen Rückverformung nach außen, von der Längsachse weg, kraft- und/oder formschlüssig fixierbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/745 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241741 A1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PANKNIN, JUERGEN

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI