Global Patent Index - EP 1241801 A1

EP 1241801 A1 2002-09-18 - SITE DIVERSITY METHOD, METHOD FOR RECEIVING DIGITAL SATELLITE BROADCAST, AND RECEIVER FOR DIGITAL SATELLITE BROADCAST

Title (en)

SITE DIVERSITY METHOD, METHOD FOR RECEIVING DIGITAL SATELLITE BROADCAST, AND RECEIVER FOR DIGITAL SATELLITE BROADCAST

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STANDORTDIVERSITÄT, VERFAHREN ZUM DIGITALEN SATELLITEN-RUNDFUNKEMPFANG UND DIGITALER SATELLITEN-RUNDFUNKEMPFÄNGER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE CONCU POUR UNE DIVERSITE DE SITES, PROCEDE DE RECEPTION DE RADIODIFFUSION SATELLITAIRE NUMERIQUE, ET RECEPTEUR CONCU A CET EFFET

Publication

EP 1241801 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00983491 A

Priority

  • JP 0008997 W
  • JP 36087599 A

Abstract (en)

A site diversity method, a digital satellite broadcast receiving method and a digital satellite broadcast receiver are provided which can make a difference of data output timing between a main station and a subsidiary station at the time of site exchange as small as possible and can perform re-synchronization as soon as possible. In the site diversity method for digital satellite broadcast, when a site exchange execution designation signal is received, the site is exchanged during a period of a TMCC information field of a predetermined specific frame of a super frame determined when the execution designation signal is received. On the receiver side, information of broadcast is continuously received by detecting a TMCC information field in a specific frame during a period of which field the site was exchanged and by establishing re-synchronization by using a super frame sync pattern W2 or W3 after the detected TMCC information field. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/08; H04L 1/06; H04L 7/08; H04L 27/22; H04N 5/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/02 (2006.01); H04B 7/08 (2006.01); H04B 7/15 (2006.01); H04B 7/185 (2006.01); H04B 7/212 (2006.01); H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04H 20/26 (2008.01); H04H 20/74 (2008.01); H04L 1/06 (2006.01); H04L 7/08 (2006.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01); H04L 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 1/06 (2013.01); H04B 7/18523 (2013.01); H04B 7/18534 (2013.01); H04B 7/2125 (2013.01); H04H 20/26 (2013.01); H04H 20/74 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241801 A1 20020918; EP 1241801 A4 20051026; EP 1241801 B1 20090916; CA 2394278 A1 20010628; CA 2394278 C 20110125; CN 100358259 C 20071226; CN 1413394 A 20030423; DE 1241801 T1 20030528; DE 60042981 D1 20091029; ES 2190385 T1 20030801; JP 2001177454 A 20010629; JP 3987258 B2 20071003; US 2002191634 A1 20021219; US 7283569 B2 20071016; WO 0147149 A1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141219

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141219

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60042981

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131209

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20120705

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, YOKOHAMA-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD, HACHIOUJI, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60042981

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD, HACHIOUJI, JP

- Document: DE 60042981

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090916

2010-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100617

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091227

2009-10-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60042981 P 20091029

2009-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-09-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OKAMURA, HIROSHINHK HOSOSENTA

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAKAJIMA, TOMOKAZUBSAT TSUSHIN

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUJII, TAKANORINHK HOSOSENTA

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NISHIJIMA, SUSUMUNHK HOSOSENTA

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MIYAMOTO, MASAKINHK MATSUYAMA HOSOKYOKU

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIRAISHI, KENICHI

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HORII, AKIHIRO

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATSUDA, SHOJI

2005-10-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 7/212 A

2005-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 7/02 B

2005-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 7/185 B

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-28 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2003-02-28 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OKAMURA, HIROSI NHK HOSOSENTA

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAKAJIMA, TOMOKAZU BSAT TSUSHIN

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUJII, TAKANORI NHK HOSOSENTA

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NISHIJIMA, SUSUMU NHK HOSOSENTA

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MIYAMOTO, MASAKI NHK MATSUYAMA HOSOKYOKU

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIRAISHI, KENICHI

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HORII, AKIHIRO

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATSUDA, SHOJI

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR