Global Patent Index - EP 1241812 A1

EP 1241812 A1 2002-09-18 - Method for determining an RDS-code with a broadcast receiver

Title (en)

Method for determining an RDS-code with a broadcast receiver

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines RDS-Codes mit einem Rundfunkempfänger

Title (fr)

Procédé à determiner un code RDS avec un récepteur de radiodiffusion

Publication

EP 1241812 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01105499 A

Priority

EP 01105499 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves looking for code in several cycles, statistically evaluating received data, fixing periodic time windows to receive TMC data at a first reception frequency with gaps, changing the frequency to tune the receiver outside the gaps at one frequency and inside at a second and determining the RDS code from the RDS data received in gaps at the second frequency so the RDS data received in several gaps is statistically evaluated.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren angegeben, mit dem ein RDS-Code, insbesondere ein Programmidentifizierungscode Pl, innerhalb des Zeitfenster Ta im RDS-TMC "enhanced mode" detektiert werden kann. Innerhalb der Lücken G im Zeitfenster Ta wird der Rundfunkempfänger auf eine zweite Empfangsfrequenz abgestimmt, wobei auf eine Synchronisation der auf der zweiten Empfangsfrequenz empfangenen RDS-Daten verzichtet wird. Vielmehr werden die innerhalb mehrerer Lücken G auf der zweiten Empfangsfrequenz gewonnenen RDS-Daten statistisch ausgewertet, so dass eine hohe Zuverlässigkeit hinsichtlich deren Richtigkeit erreicht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; G08G 1/09; H03J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 20/30 (2008.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01); H04H 40/27 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/30 (2013.01); G08G 1/094 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 40/27 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241812 A1 20020918; EP 1241812 B1 20060614; DE 50110149 D1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130315

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130315

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130315

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060923

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110149 P 20060727

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-06-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI