Global Patent Index - EP 1241814 A1

EP 1241814 A1 2002-09-18 - RDS-TMC Broadcast Receiver and Method for Calibrating an Internal Clock of a Broadcast Receiver

Title (en)

RDS-TMC Broadcast Receiver and Method for Calibrating an Internal Clock of a Broadcast Receiver

Title (de)

RDS-TMC-Rundfunkempfänger und Verfahren zum Kalibrieren eines internen Zeitgebers in einem Rundfunkempfänger

Title (fr)

Récepteur de Radiodiffusion RDS-TMC et Procédé de Calibration d'une Horloge Interne d'un Récepteur de Radiodiffusion

Publication

EP 1241814 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01106302 A

Priority

EP 01106302 A

Abstract (en)

The method for calibrating the internal clock of a radio receiver that is designed to receive and evaluate an external time signal received at regular intervals. The internal clock is used to measure a time interval between the receipt of two external time signals, the measured time interval is compared with the expected time interval and a calibration factor is determined for the internal clock which is then used to calibrate the internal clock. An independent claim is made for a radio receiver in which the internal clock is calibrated using an external RDS radio time signal (CT).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Kalibrieren eines internen Zeitgebers in einem Rundfunkempfänger, insbesondere einem RDS-TMC-Rundfunkempfänger. Der RDS-TMC-Rundfunkempfänger ist zum Empfang und zur Auswertung des RDS-Zeitcodes CT ausgelegt. Der CT-Zeitcode wird von Rundfunksendern nur in fest vorgegebenen Abständen ausgesendet, so dass in der Zwischenzeit eine hohe Genauigkeit des internen Zeitgebers gefordert ist, um im TMC-Enhanced-Mode keine Verkehrsdaten zu verpassen. Erfindungsgemäß ist daher vorgesehen, dass der interne Zeitgeber mit einem Kalibrierungsfaktor kalibriert wird, der unter Einbeziehung des externen CT-Zeitcodes ermittelt wurde. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; G04G 5/00; G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 3/02 (2006.01); G04G 5/00 (2013.01); G04R 20/20 (2013.01); G04R 40/06 (2013.01); G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01); H04H 40/27 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 40/27 (2013.01); G04G 3/022 (2013.01); G04R 20/20 (2013.01); G04R 40/06 (2013.01); G08G 1/093 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241814 A1 20020918; EP 1241814 B1 20060628; DE 50110332 D1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50110332

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130315

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130315

2013-02-28 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20120630

2012-10-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20120630

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110315

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110332 P 20060810

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-06-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060628

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2003-12-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI