Global Patent Index - EP 1241903 A2

EP 1241903 A2 2002-09-18 - Wireless communication system using user-owned access points

Title (en)

Wireless communication system using user-owned access points

Title (de)

Drahtloses Kommunikationssystem mit Nutzereigenen Zugangspunkten

Title (fr)

Système de communication sans fil à points d'accès tenus par utilisateurs

Publication

EP 1241903 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02005383 A

Priority

  • JP 2001076531 A
  • JP 2002045240 A

Abstract (en)

In a wireless communication system formed by a plurality of access points constituting a wireless network, through which user terminals make accesses, and at least one control station configured to control the access points, public access points are systematically set up by a manager of the control station, while user's personal access points to be freely set up by users at desired locations according to needs of users are accommodated by operating the control station to measure a utilization level of each user's personal access point and charge an owner of each user's personal access point according to a measured utilization level and set up relay routes using the public access points and the user's personal access points. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 84/04 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 84/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241903 A2 20020918; EP 1241903 A3 20030820; EP 1241903 B1 20060315; CA 2376987 A1 20020916; CA 2376987 C 20050726; DE 60209826 D1 20060511; DE 60209826 T2 20061005; KR 100487062 B1 20050503; KR 20020074081 A 20020928; US 2002151300 A1 20021017; US 7075912 B2 20060711

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150315

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150315

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150315

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60209826

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140312

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140318

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60209826 P 20060511

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-03-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040309

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI