Global Patent Index - EP 1241919 A2

EP 1241919 A2 2002-09-18 - A method for reducing distortion in a receiver

Title (en)

A method for reducing distortion in a receiver

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verzerrungsverringerung bei einem Empfänger

Title (fr)

Procédé de réduction de la distorsion dans un récepteur

Publication

EP 1241919 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02251724 A

Priority

  • US 27508601 P
  • US 9581901 A

Abstract (en)

A receiver, such as for use in a hearing aid, is disclosed. The receiver comprises a housing and a diaphragm assembly disposed within the housing. The diaphragm assembly acoustically divides the housing into a front volume and a back volume. The diaphragm assembly comprises a paddle having a perimeter, a flexible annulus connected to the paddle, and a diaphragm support, wherein the diaphragm support secures the perimeter of the annulus to the housing. The receiver further comprises a plurality of apertures in the diaphragm assembly, wherein the plurality of apertures provides an acoustic distortion of no greater than 2% THD. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 11/02; H04R 11/06; H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 11/02 (2006.01); H04R 11/06 (2006.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 11/02 (2013.01); H04R 11/06 (2013.01); H04R 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241919 A2 20020918; EP 1241919 A3 20030716; EP 1241919 B1 20111005; DK 1241919 T3 20120206

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60241200

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-11-05 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2012-10-31 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60241200

- Effective date: 20120706

2012-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120706

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111005

2012-02-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2012-01-25 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20111005

2011-12-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60241200

- Effective date: 20111201

2011-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK NL

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061206

2004-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK NL

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI