Global Patent Index - EP 1241924 A3

EP 1241924 A3 2004-12-08 - Street lighting management system

Title (en)

Street lighting management system

Title (de)

Verwaltungsvorrichtung zur Strassenbeleuchtung

Title (fr)

Système de gestion d'éclairage public

Publication

EP 1241924 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02250877 A

Priority

GB 0103214 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1241924A2] A street lighting management system includes modules (10) for mounting on the street lights and for transmitting data to sub-master units (13) which collate the information and transmit it to a master unit (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 37/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/0272 (2013.01); H05B 37/034 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241924 A2 20020918; EP 1241924 A3 20041208; GB 0103214 D0 20010328; GB 2372160 A 20020814; GB 2372160 B 20030910

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071220

2007-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070809

2005-10-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050730

2005-09-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-21 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: MAYFLOWER INTELLIGENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS LIMITED

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI