Global Patent Index - EP 1241963 A2

EP 1241963 A2 2002-09-25 - HEALTH AND COMFORT SUPPORT SYSTEM INCLUDING COMMON APPLICATION

Title (en)

HEALTH AND COMFORT SUPPORT SYSTEM INCLUDING COMMON APPLICATION

Title (de)

HYGIENISCHE UND KOMFORTABELE STÜTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERSCHIEDENE ZWECKE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SOUTIEN SAIN ET CONFORTABLE A APPLICATIONS MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 1241963 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00992266 A

Priority

  • US 0042417 W
  • US 16816199 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0140012A2] A vehicle seat arrangement having a plurality of air cells therein for supporting a user including a plurality of air cells (100) with expandable chambers comprising a fixed array; a controller (110) for connecting said plurality of air cells and a fluid supply system that includes fittings for cutting off one or more of the air cells from the controller to conform the fixed array of air cells to one of a plurality of vehicle types (100, 112, 118).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 4/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/44 (2006.01); B60N 2/48 (2006.01); B60N 2/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/865 (2018.02); B60N 2/665 (2015.04); B60N 2/885 (2018.02); B60N 2/914 (2018.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0140012 A2 20010607; WO 0140012 A3 20020221; WO 0140012 A9 20020801; AU 3971401 A 20010612; EP 1241963 A2 20020925; EP 1241963 A4 20030514

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060510

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CTEX SEAT COMFORT LTD

2003-05-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47C 4/54 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60N 2/44 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60N 2/48 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60N 2/66 B

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORAN, SCOTT, J.

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEEKS, RYAN, K.

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI