Global Patent Index - EP 1242050 A2

EP 1242050 A2 2002-09-25 - SURVIVIN PROMOTION OF ANGIOGENESIS

Title (en)

SURVIVIN PROMOTION OF ANGIOGENESIS

Title (de)

FÖRDERUNG DER ANGIOGENESE DURCH SURVIVIN

Title (fr)

STIMULATION DE L'ANGIOGEN SE PAR L'UTILISATION DE SURVIVINE

Publication

EP 1242050 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00990262 A

Priority

  • US 0034663 W
  • US 17299199 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146455A2] The present invention discloses methods for promoting angiogenesis using agents that increase the activity function and/or expression of survivin. The present invention also discloses methods for inhibiting angiogenesis using agents that inhibit activity, the function and/or expression of survivin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47; A61K 31/711; A61K 31/713; A61K 38/17; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/515; C12N 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 38/48 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61L 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/515 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4747 (2013.01); C07K 14/515 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146455 A2 20010628; WO 0146455 A3 20020510; AU 2730801 A 20010703; CA 2393646 A1 20010628; EP 1242050 A2 20020925; EP 1242050 A4 20040526; JP 2003529554 A 20031007; MX PA02006167 A 20040226

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051002

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050322

2004-05-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 A

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/515 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/12 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/711 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/713 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/17 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 B

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI