Global Patent Index - EP 1242079 A1

EP 1242079 A1 2002-09-25 - METHODS OF USE OF FLUOROQUINOLONE COMPOUNDS AGAINTS BACTERIA

Title (en)

METHODS OF USE OF FLUOROQUINOLONE COMPOUNDS AGAINTS BACTERIA

Title (de)

METHODE ZUR ANTI-BAKTERIELLEN VERWENDUNG VON FLUOROQUINOLON-VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

Méthodes d'utilisation anti-bactérienne de composés fluoroquinoloniques

Publication

EP 1242079 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00966806 A

Priority

  • AR 9904837 A
  • DE 19945885 A
  • ES 9902113 A
  • ES 9902112 A
  • ES 9902111 A
  • ES 9902114 A
  • GR 99100318 A
  • GR 99100321 A
  • IT MI991997 A
  • JP 30975499 A
  • JP 30975699 A
  • JP 30975599 A
  • US 0026056 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0121176A1] This invention relates, in part, to newly identifid methods of using quinoline antibiotics, particulrly a gemifloxacin compound against certain bactera, particularly pathogenic bacteria

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4375 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4709 (2013.01); A61K 31/4375 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0121176 A1 20010329; AU 7709400 A 20010424; EP 1242079 A1 20020925; EP 1242079 A4 20030122; EP 1561465 A2 20050810; EP 1561465 A3 20051221

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050613

2004-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LG LIFE SCIENCES, LTD.

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-01-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021206

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/4709 A, 7A 61P 31/04 B

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020422

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI