Global Patent Index - EP 1242080 A1

EP 1242080 A1 2002-09-25 - DOPAMINE TRANSPORTER INHIBITORS AND THEIR USE

Title (en)

DOPAMINE TRANSPORTER INHIBITORS AND THEIR USE

Title (de)

INHIBITOREN VON DOPAMINETRANSPORT UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DU TRANSPORTEUR DE DOPAMINE ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1242080 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00968417 A

Priority

  • US 0026447 W
  • US 15579799 P
  • US 22658100 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0122964A1] The present invention provides a novel class of compounds. The compounds are inhibitors of dopamine transporter and therefore are useful in the treatment of disorders related to dopamine transporter activity. One aspect of the present invention provides a class of compounds of formula (I): wherein R1 is an alkyl, aryl, alkyl-aryl, aromatic ring containing one or more hetero atoms; R2 is an alkyl, aryl, aromatic ring containing one or more hetero atoms, ketone, hydroxyl, alcohol, aldehyde, ester, acid, amide group, or (1) or (2), wherein R' is a phenyl ring optionally substituted with one or more halogens or one or more saturated or unsaturated alkyl (C1-5) group, or aromatic ring with one or more hereto atoms optionally substituted with one or more halogens or one or more saturated or unsaturated alkyl (C1-5) group; R3 is F, C1, Br, I, OH, OR', or OC=OR', wherein R' is an alkyl, aryl, aromatic ring containing one or more hetero atoms, or a -O- bond with R2 when R2 is hydroxyl or alcohol; R4 is an alkyl, aryl, alkyl-aryl; aromatic ring containing one or more hetero atoms, hydroxyl, alcohol, aldehyde, ester, acid, amide group.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/44; A61K 31/445; C07D 211/40; C07D 211/52; C07D 471/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 211/52 (2006.01); C07D 491/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 491/04 (2013.01); C07D 211/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0122964 A1 20010405; CA 2389049 A1 20010405; EP 1242080 A1 20020925; EP 1242080 A4 20030122

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041119

2003-01-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021209

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/436 A, 7A 61K 31/451 B, 7C 07D 211/52 B, 7C 07D 491/056 B, 7A 61P 25/16 B, 7A 61P 25/24 B, 7A 61P 25/30 B

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE