Global Patent Index - EP 1242109 A2

EP 1242109 A2 2002-09-25 - A METHOD FOR TREATING VIRAL DISEASES AND OTHER DISORDERS BY ALTERING IMMEDIATE GENE EXPRESSION THROUGH ADMINISTRATION OF PEPTIDE T

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR TREATING VIRAL DISEASES AND OTHER DISORDERS BY ALTERING IMMEDIATE GENE EXPRESSION THROUGH ADMINISTRATION OF PEPTIDE T

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VIURUSERKRANKUNGEN UND ANDEREN STÖRUNGEN DURCH VERÄNDERUNG DER "IMMEDIATE GENE EXPRESSION" DURCH VERABREICHUNG VON PEPTID T

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR TRAITER DES MALADIES VIRALES ET D'AUTRES TROUBLES PAR LA MODIFICATION DE L'EXPRESSION GENIQUE IMMEDIATE AU MOYEN DE L'ADMINISTRATION DU PEPTIDE T

Publication

EP 1242109 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00990995 A

Priority

  • US 0042030 W
  • US 16436399 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0134095A2] A method for inhibiting viral replication and for treating neurotropic conditions by regulating/inhibiting immediate early gene expression in host cells comprises administrating an inhibiting/regulating effective amount of a peptide of formula (I): R<a>-Ser-Thr-Thr-Thr-Asn-Tyr-R<b> where R<a> represents an amino terminal residue Ala- or D- Ala and R<b> represents a carboxy terminal residue -Thr or -Thr amide or a derivative thereof with an additional Cys- residue at one or both of the amino and carboxy terminals, or a peptide of formula (II): R1-R2-R3-R4-R5 where R1 is an amino terminal residue Thr-, Ser-, Asn-, Glu-, Arg-, Ile- or Leu-, R2 is Thr, Ser, or Asp, R3 is Thr, Ser, Asn, Arg, Gln, Lys, or Trp, R4 is Tyr and R5 is preferably a carboxy terminal residue -Thr, -Arg or Gly or a derivative thereof with a corresponding D-amino acid as the amino terminal residue, and/or a corresponding amide derivative at the carboxy terminal residue and/or additionally a Cys- residue at one or both of the amino and carboxy terminals, in a physiologically suitable carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/08; A61P 31/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/08 (2013.01); Y02A 50/467 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0134095 A2 20010517; WO 0134095 A8 20011129; AU 3080001 A 20010606; CA 2389392 A1 20010517; CN 1635913 A 20050706; EP 1242109 A2 20020925; EP 1242109 A4 20040602; IL 149443 D0 20021110; JP 2003528817 A 20030930; KR 20020063182 A 20020801; MX PA02004619 A 20040910; ZA 200203120 B 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051216

2004-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A METHOD FOR TREATING VIRAL DISEASES AND OTHER DISORDERS BY ALTERING IMMEDIATE GENE EXPRESSION THROUGH ADMINISTRATION OF

2004-06-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/08 A

2004-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 31/12 B

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI