Global Patent Index - EP 1242188 A1

EP 1242188 A1 2002-09-25 - ELECTROSTATIC SEPARATOR

Title (en)

ELECTROSTATIC SEPARATOR

Title (de)

ELEKTROABSCHEIDER

Title (fr)

SEPARATEUR ELECTROSTATIQUE

Publication

EP 1242188 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01953864 A

Priority

  • DE 0102487 W
  • DE 10033642 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10033642C1] The invention relates to an electrostatic separator, for the separation of fluid or solid particles from a gas stream. Said electrostatic separator comprises a tube (1), through which the gas for purification flows in a longitudinal direction, the inner wall (1A) of which forms a collector electrode for the particles to be separated out. An inner electrode (2) is arranged running longitudinally in the middle of the tube (1) and an electrical high voltage field exists between said inner electrode and the collector electrode. The inlet end of the inner electrode (2) comprises a first section (2A), with a low cross-sectional area and the outlet end comprises a second section (2B), with a larger cross-sectional area, relative to the first. The first section thus essentially serves for the formation of a corona and the second section serves to generate an electrostatic separating field. A cleaning body (3) is provided for cleaning the section of the inner electrode forming the corona, which, in order to clean said inner section of the inner electrode forming the corona, moves relative thereto and in physical contact therewith. Furthermore, the operating element (4) for carrying out said relative movement is located in a space-saving manner within the inner electrode (2) which has a hollow form.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 3/74; B03C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/04 (2006.01); B03C 3/02 (2006.01); B03C 3/06 (2006.01); B03C 3/38 (2006.01); B03C 3/40 (2006.01); B03C 3/41 (2006.01); B03C 3/49 (2006.01); B03C 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/743 (2013.01); B03C 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0204126A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10033642 C1 20010809; BR 0106895 A 20020430; EP 1242188 A1 20020925; EP 1242188 B1 20050330; JP 2004502531 A 20040129; US 2002194997 A1 20021226; US 6635105 B2 20031021; WO 0204126 A1 20020117

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-07-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50105767 P 20050504

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENGST GMBH & CO. KG

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR