Global Patent Index - EP 1242193 A2

EP 1242193 A2 2002-09-25 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING COATED METAL SURFACES AND THE USE OF SAID METAL SURFACES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING COATED METAL SURFACES AND THE USE OF SAID METAL SURFACES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BESCHICHTETEN METALLOBERFLÄCHEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE SURFACES METALLIQUES A REVETEMENT ET UTILISATION DESDITES SURFACES

Publication

EP 1242193 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00983330 A

Priority

  • DE 19961411 A
  • EP 0012745 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143888A2] The invention relates to a method for producing coated metal surfaces at a coating speed of at least 25 m per minute during the application of a pre-treating agent to a cleaned and/or pickled metal surface. The inventive method is characterized by applying at least one pre-treating agent to at least one surface of a metal body after cleaning and/or pickling the metal surface to be treated. At least one lacquer layer is applied to a part of the pre-treated surface, the coating produced only by the pre-treating agent and not by the lacquer being used as the treatment layer instead of a priming or pre-treatment layer. The invention further relates to a method for producing coated metal surfaces at a coating speed of at least 25 m per minute during the application of a pre-treating agent to a cleaned and/or pickled metal surface. The inventive method is characterized by applying at least one pre-treating agent to at least one surface of a metal body after cleaning and/or pickling the metal surface to be treated. At least one lacquer layer is applied to at least a part of the pre-treated surface, the coating produced only by the pre-treating agent being used as the treatment layer instead of a priming or pre-treatment layer.

[origin: WO0143888A2] The invention relates to a method for producing coated metal surfaces at a coating speed of at least 25 m per minute during the application of a pre-treating agent to a cleaned and/or pickled metal surface. The inventive method is characterized by applying at least one pre-treating agent to at least one surface of a metal body after cleaning and/or pickling the metal surface to be treated. At least one lacquer layer is applied to a part of the pre-treated surface, the coating produced only by the pre-treating agent and not by the lacquer being used as the treatment layer instead of a priming or pre-treatment layer. The invention further relates to a method for producing coated metal surfaces at a coating speed of at least 25 m per minute during the application of a pre-treating agent to a cleaned and/or pickled metal surface. The inventive method is characterized by applying at least one pre-treating agent to at least one surface of a metal body after cleaning and/or pickling the metal surface to be treated. At least one lacquer layer is applied to at least a part of the pre-treated surface, the coating produced only by the pre-treating agent being used as the treatment layer instead of a priming or pre-treatment layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 3/10; B05D 7/00; B05D 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/10 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/14 (2006.01); C23C 22/00 (2006.01); C23C 22/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/544 (2013.01); B05D 3/102 (2013.01); B05D 7/14 (2013.01); C23C 22/00 (2013.01); C23C 22/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0143888A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143888 A2 20010621; WO 0143888 A3 20011206; AT 248032 T 20030915; AU 2010401 A 20010625; AU 774014 B2 20040610; AU 774014 C 20050428; CA 2394235 A1 20010621; CN 1409657 A 20030409; DE 19961411 A1 20010621; EP 1242193 A2 20020925; EP 1242193 B1 20030827; ES 2203539 T3 20040416; US 2003051772 A1 20030320; ZA 200205289 B 20030728

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGRI BE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 20160615

2016-06-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203539 T3

2004-01-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040127

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031214

2003-12-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031214

2003-12-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031214

2003-11-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003490 P 20031002

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-27 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR