Global Patent Index - EP 1242216 A1

EP 1242216 A1 2002-09-25 - PERCUSSION SUPPORTED HAND DRILL

Title (en)

PERCUSSION SUPPORTED HAND DRILL

Title (de)

SCHLAGUNTERSTÜTZTE HANDBOHRMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PERCEUSE A MAIN A PERCUSSION

Publication

EP 1242216 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00984895 A

Priority

  • DE 0004084 W
  • DE 19961586 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145908A1] The invention relates to a schlag supported hand drill having a tool holder (10) which can be powered by a motor (14) having a roataion frequency and a Schlag frequency. The rotataional fequency and the Schlag frequency are matched with each other in such a way that at a certain rotational frequency ein bei einem Schlag aufgespannter Winkelbereich (w) between a groove (18) and an adjacent groove (20) in the circumferential direction with subsequent Schlägen and the same groove angle distances alpha abarbeitbar ist wie bei einer kleineren VErgleichsdrehfrequenz.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 16/00 (2013.01); B25D 2211/068 (2013.01); B25D 2216/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145908A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145908 A1 20010628; WO 0145908 A9 20040429; CN 100346935 C 20071107; CN 1545443 A 20041110; DE 19961586 A1 20010705; DE 50013476 D1 20061026; EP 1242216 A1 20020925; EP 1242216 B1 20060913; JP 2004509772 A 20040402

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161118

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161118

2017-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013476 P 20061026

2006-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2006-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2006-09-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PERCUSSION SUPPORTED HAND DRILL

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI