Global Patent Index - EP 1242217 A1

EP 1242217 A1 2002-09-25 - METHOD FOR CUTTING BOND PAPERS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CUTTING BOND PAPERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON WERTPAPIEREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DECOUPER DES PAPIERS-VALEURS

Publication

EP 1242217 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00982815 A

Priority

  • CH 0000684 W
  • CH 239599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0149464A1] The invention relates to a method comprising the following steps: a stack of sheets is moved under a blade in order to cut a first free strip of the stack of sheets; the first strip is cut; the stack of sheets is subsequently moved, whereupon it executes a first rotation and is guided under the blade once again in order to cut a second free strip; the second strip is cut; the stack is subsequently moved, whereupon it executes a second rotation and is guided under the blade once again in order to cut a third free strip; the third free strip and successive stacks of bond paper strips are cut, and; the successive stacks of bond paper strips are cut into individual bond papers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/01; B26D 7/06; B26D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/10 (2006.01); B26D 1/06 (2006.01); B26D 1/08 (2006.01); B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26D 11/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/015 (2013.01); B26D 7/0675 (2013.01); B26D 11/00 (2013.01); B26D 2007/0056 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4229 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0448 (2015.04); Y10T 83/6476 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0149464A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0149464 A1 20010712; AT 259281 T 20040215; AU 1980401 A 20010716; AU 772820 B2 20040506; CA 2395853 A1 20010712; CA 2395853 C 20080819; CN 1270879 C 20060823; CN 1414896 A 20030430; DE 50005285 D1 20040318; EP 1242217 A1 20020925; EP 1242217 B1 20040211; JP 2003519017 A 20030617; RU 2002120517 A 20040210; RU 2243885 C2 20050110; UA 73759 C2 20021015; US 2003131702 A1 20030717

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005285

- Representative's name: REBLE KLOSE SCHMITT PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161107

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Effective date: 20141223

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 259281 T

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111223

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-02-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KBA-GIORI S.A., LAUSANNE, CH

- Document: DE 50005285

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005285

- Representative's name: REBLE & KLOSE RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005285

- Representative's name: REBLE KLOSE SCHMITT PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20111222

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA

- Free text: KBA-GIORI S.A.#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KBA-NOTASYS SA#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH)

2010-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BA-GIORI S.A.

- Free text: KBA-GIORI S.A.#4, RUE DE LA PAIX#1003 LAUSANNE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KBA-GIORI S.A.#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040711

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *KBA-GIORI

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *KBA-GIORI

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-05-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040522

2004-05-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-05-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-05-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005285 P 20040318

2004-03-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-11 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI