Global Patent Index - EP 1242227 A2

EP 1242227 A2 2002-09-25 - MANIFOLD SYSTEM HAVING PROPORTIONAL FLOW CONTROL

Title (en)

MANIFOLD SYSTEM HAVING PROPORTIONAL FLOW CONTROL

Title (de)

VERTEILERSYSTEM MIT PROPORTIONAL-DURCHFLUSSSTEUERUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REGULER PROPORTIONNELLEMENT UNE DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE DANS UN MOULE

Publication

EP 1242227 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00974058 A

Priority

  • US 0030421 W
  • US 43492899 A
  • US 43471899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0134364A2] In an injection molding machine having first and second nozzles for delivering melt material from a common manifold to one or more mold cavities, apparatus for controlling delivery of the melt material from the nozzles to the one or more mold cavities, each nozzle having an exit aperture communicating with a gate of a cavity of a mold and being associated with an actuator interconnected to a melt flow controller, the apparatus comprising: a sensor for sensing a selected condition of the melt material through at least one of the nozzles; an actuator controller interconnected to each actuator, each actuator controller comprising a computer interconnected to a sensor for receiving a signal representative of the selected condition sensed by the sensor, the computer including an algorithm utilizing a value corresponding to a signal received from the sensor as a variable for controlling operation of an actuator for the at least one nozzle; wherein at least one of the nozzles has a seal surface disposed on a tip end of the nozzle which is engaged and in compressed contact with a complementary surface surrounding the gate of a cavity of a mold, the engaged surfaces forming a seal against leakage of the melt material around the nozzle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 45/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/27 (2006.01); B29C 45/28 (2006.01); B29C 45/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/27 (2013.01); B29C 45/2806 (2013.01); B29C 45/281 (2013.01); B29C 45/30 (2013.01); B29C 2045/2687 (2013.01); B29C 2045/2722 (2013.01); B29C 2045/2761 (2013.01); B29C 2045/279 (2013.01); B29C 2045/2817 (2013.01); B29C 2045/2882 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0134364A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0134364 A2 20010517; WO 0134364 A3 20020110; AU 1248801 A 20010606; CA 2390267 A1 20010517; CA 2390267 C 20100824; EP 1242227 A2 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNVENTIVE MOLDING SOLUTIONS, INC.

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KAZMER, DAVID

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOSS, MARK, D.

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNVENTIVE MOLDING SOLUTIONS, INC.

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI