Global Patent Index - EP 1242259 A1

EP 1242259 A1 2002-09-25 - HEATING-AIR CONDITIONING INSTALLATION FOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

HEATING-AIR CONDITIONING INSTALLATION FOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

HEIZUNGS- UND KLIMAANLAGE FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE-CLIMATISATION POUR VEHICULES

Publication

EP 1242259 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01982530 A

Priority

  • DE 10052136 A
  • FR 0103266 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0232705A1] The invention concerns a heating-air conditioning installation for a vehicle, comprising an evaporator (10) and a heating element (12, 14), a fan and various air outlet channels (2, 4, 6), at least means controlling the air stream (20) being placed beside the evaporator (10), according to fluid mechanics. In different positions of the air stream control means, part of the heating-air conditioning installation can be traversed by air in different directions, so that a bypass channel relative to the evaporator may be produced without requiring additional structural volume.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00685 (2013.01); B60H 1/0005 (2013.01); B60H 1/00564 (2013.01); B60H 2001/00128 (2013.01); B60H 2001/00164 (2013.01); B60H 2001/2287 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0232705A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0232705 A1 20020425; DE 10052136 A1 20020502; EP 1242259 A1 20020925; JP 2004511386 A 20040415; US 2003094261 A1 20030522; US 2006108094 A1 20060525

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081104

2008-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080423

2004-06-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR IT LI

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR