Global Patent Index - EP 1242278 A2

EP 1242278 A2 2002-09-25 - HEAT EXCHANGER WITH BEVELED HEADER

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER WITH BEVELED HEADER

Title (de)

WARMETAUSCHER MIT ABGESCHRÄGTEN ENDKAMMERN

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE AVEC COLLECTEUR BISEAUTE

Publication

EP 1242278 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00990445 A

Priority

  • US 0041599 W
  • US 42756599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0131264A2] A header (204) for a keel cooler heat exchanger (200), the header (204) having a beveled closed end portion (216).

[origin: WO0131264A2] A header for a heat exchanger, the header having a beveled closed end portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 21/10; F28D 1/04; F28F 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/20 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 1/04 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/022 (2013.01); B63B 3/38 (2013.01); B63H 21/383 (2013.01); F01P 3/207 (2013.01); F28D 1/05366 (2013.01); F28F 1/04 (2013.01); F28F 9/02 (2013.01); F28F 9/0224 (2013.01); F28F 9/0246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0131264 A2 20010503; WO 0131264 A3 20020117; WO 0131264 A8 20020808; AU 2747201 A 20010508; BR 0015212 A 20020618; BR 0015212 B1 20101116; CA 2389845 A1 20010503; CA 2389845 C 20050628; CN 1270938 C 20060823; CN 1382089 A 20021127; EP 1242278 A2 20020925; EP 1242278 A4 20031015; KR 20020047266 A 20020621; ZA 200202796 B 20070131

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080711

2006-03-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050830

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB LI NL

2003-10-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030828

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020415

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE