Global Patent Index - EP 1242285 A1

EP 1242285 A1 2002-09-25 - PLASTIC BOTTLE, COMPRISING REINFORCING MEANS

Title (en)

PLASTIC BOTTLE, COMPRISING REINFORCING MEANS

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFFFLASCHE MIT VERSTÄRKUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

BOUTEILLE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE, PRESENTANT DES MOYENS DE RENFORCEMENT

Publication

EP 1242285 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00958599 A

Priority

  • FR 0002124 W
  • FR 9910346 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2797251A1] The invention concerns a plastic bottle, wherein reinforcing means (50) are formed by a circular groove provided around the body (10) of the bottle. The groove comprises, from the base upwards, a lower part (51) to be connected to the body, a central part (52), and an upper part (53) to be connected to the body. Each of said parts has a constant peripheral profile, the central part having a peripheral profile with simple curvature with a concave part facing outwards of the bottle, the upper and lower parts having each a profile with simple curvature and a concave part facing inwards of the bottle, and the upper and lower parts are each connected tangentially to the body and the central part. The invention is particularly applicable to bottles designed to be filled with carbonated or aerated drinks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/02; B65D 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/00 (2006.01); B65D 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 23/102 (2013.01); B65D 1/0223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0110724A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2797251 A1 20010209; FR 2797251 B1 20011012; AU 7007000 A 20010305; AU 773409 B2 20040527; BR 0012958 A 20020514; CA 2378973 A1 20010215; CN 1138681 C 20040218; CN 1368926 A 20020911; EP 1242285 A1 20020925; JP 2003506277 A 20030218; MX PA02001129 A 20021031; PL 353139 A1 20031020; US 6695162 B1 20040224; WO 0110724 A1 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100225

2009-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091014

2009-10-07 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020717

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIDEL

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI