Global Patent Index - EP 1242291 A1

EP 1242291 A1 2002-09-25 - APPARATUS AND PACKAGE FOR THE METERED DISPENSING OF A VISCOUS MATERIAL

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND PACKAGE FOR THE METERED DISPENSING OF A VISCOUS MATERIAL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERPACKUNG ZUM ABGEBEN VON ABGEMESSENEN MENGEN EINES PASTÖSEN MATERIALS

Publication

EP 1242291 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00991309 A

Priority

  • NL 0000904 W
  • NL 1013778 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142100A1] A metering apparatus for emptying a package containing a viscous material, which apparatus comprises a frame (1) with a substantially flat supporting surface, on which a package (6) manufactured from a flexible foil material can be positioned, and a metering control means (2, 3, 4), which can empty the package by means of activation. The package (6) can be squeezed nipwise by cooperation with the supporting surface, starting from a first end in the direction of an opposite second end, by moving the metering control means, for instance a roller or rod, relative to the package, while through at least one discharge opening (6d) at the second end the viscous material is expelled from the package and the nipwise squeezing can be continued until at least the discharge opening (6d).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 35/28; B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B65D 35/22 (2006.01); B65D 35/28 (2006.01); B65D 35/40 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/28 (2013.01); B65D 81/325 (2013.01); B65D 81/3261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142100A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142100 A1 20010614; WO 0142100 A8 20010719; AT 276150 T 20041015; AU 3241201 A 20010618; AU 776642 B2 20040916; CA 2393700 A1 20010614; CN 1407937 A 20030402; DE 60013902 D1 20041021; EP 1242291 A1 20020925; EP 1242291 B1 20040915; JP 2003516285 A 20030513; NL 1013778 C2 20010612; US 2003098316 A1 20030529

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041226

2004-12-16 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041216

2004-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041207

2004-12-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041207

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60013902 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI