Global Patent Index - EP 1242296 A1

EP 1242296 A1 2002-09-25 - CONTAINER WITH A DISPENSING VALVE

Title (en)

CONTAINER WITH A DISPENSING VALVE

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER MIT EINEM ABGABEVENTIL

Title (fr)

CONTENANT COMPORTANT UNE SOUPAPE DE DISTRIBUTION

Publication

EP 1242296 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99958154 A

Priority

EP 9909417 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0140078A1] The invention relates to a container (1), in particular in bottle form, comprising a dispensing valve (7), for metered dispensing of a fluid stored, preferably, under pressure, an opening lever (9), for operating the dispensing valve and a safety element (13) for the opening lever, which, in its safety position, engages with the opening lever and supports said lever, ensuring no operation can occur.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/16 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/201 (2013.01); B65D 83/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0140078A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0140078 A1 20010607; AR 022166 A1 20020904; AU 1558500 A 20010612; DE 59908979 D1 20040429; EP 1242296 A1 20020925; EP 1242296 B1 20040324; ES 2219083 T3 20041116

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101203

2012-02-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120206

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101202

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101202

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101202

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20100920

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091230

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219083 T3

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908979 P 20040429

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT