Global Patent Index - EP 1242317 A1

EP 1242317 A1 2002-09-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING WATER BY OXYGENATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING WATER BY OXYGENATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WASSERBEHANDLUNG DURCH SAUERSTOFFANREICHERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE EAU PAR OXYGENATION

Publication

EP 1242317 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00981442 A

Priority

  • FR 0003217 W
  • FR 9915397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142146A1] The invention relates to a method for treating water containing different oxidizable compounds to be treated. According to said method, a gas containing oxygen is injected into said water in such a way as to oxidize said oxidizable compounds. The gas containing oxygen can be a first gas containing 21 to 100 % of oxygen or a second gas containing 21 to 100 % oxygen which is different from the first gas. The choice as to which of these oxygen-containing gases is injected is continuously made according to the cost of the oxygen that is transferred and the quantity of oxygen that is required for treating the water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C02F 3/00; C02F 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/72 (2006.01); C02F 1/00 (2006.01); C02F 1/74 (2006.01); C02F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/72 (2013.01); C02F 1/008 (2013.01); C02F 1/74 (2013.01); C02F 3/02 (2013.01); Y02W 10/15 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142146A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142146 A1 20010614; AU 1868901 A 20010618; BR 0016260 A 20020820; EP 1242317 A1 20020925; FR 2801879 A1 20010608; FR 2801879 B1 20020301

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2004-04-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHEVALIER, GILBERT

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FAVIER, PASCAL

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DURTSCHI, FRANCK, STEPHANE

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FERRAND, FREDERIQUE

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI