Global Patent Index - EP 1242318 A2

EP 1242318 A2 2002-09-25 - METHOD FOR BIOLOGICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMAL BREEDING EFFLUENT AND DEVICE THEREFOR

Title (en)

METHOD FOR BIOLOGICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMAL BREEDING EFFLUENT AND DEVICE THEREFOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER ABWÄSSER AUS DER TIERZUCHT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT BIOLOGIQUE D'EFFLUENT D'ELEVAGE ET LE DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1242318 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 01978516 A

Priority

  • FR 0103106 W
  • FR 0012890 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2815028A1] The process of biological treatment of animal farm effluent is of two-stage type and comprises first stage of treatment with anaerobic flora and second stage of aerobic treatment with filament micro-fungi. An Independent claim is also included for installation for conducting process as claimed, comprising: (i) first installation for decantation of effluent and treatment of decanted matter with anaerobic flora; (ii) second installation for treatment of effluent recovered from the first installation with filament fungi in presence of oxygen; (iii) system supplying farm effluent to the first installation; (iv) system transferring effluent from the first installation to the second installation; and (v) system for removal of treated effluent from the second installation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C02F 3/28; C02F 3/30; C02F 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 3/28 (2006.01); C02F 3/30 (2006.01); C02F 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 3/308 (2013.01); C02F 3/28 (2013.01); C02F 3/34 (2013.01); C02F 2103/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0230834A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2815028 A1 20020412; FR 2815028 B1 20041217; AU 1062402 A 20020422; EP 1242318 A2 20020925; EP 1889815 A1 20080220; WO 0230834 A2 20020418; WO 0230834 A3 20020620

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-05-06 [19A] STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040226

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LAUGERO, CHANTAL

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TILLIER, DENIS

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LAUGERO, CHANTAL

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TILLIER, DENIS

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI