Global Patent Index - EP 1242341 A1

EP 1242341 A1 2002-09-25 - PROCESSES FOR PREVENTING GENERATION OF HYDROGEN HALIDES IN AN OLIGOMERIZATION PRODUCT RECOVERY SYSTEM

Title (en)

PROCESSES FOR PREVENTING GENERATION OF HYDROGEN HALIDES IN AN OLIGOMERIZATION PRODUCT RECOVERY SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON HALOGENWASSERSTOFF-BILDUNG IN EINEM SYSTEM ZUR RÜCKGEWIINUNG VON OLIGOMERISATIONSPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'EVITER LA GENERATION D'HALOGENURES D'HYDROGENE DANS UN SYSTEME DE RECUPERATION DE PRODUITS D'OLIGOMERISATION

Publication

EP 1242341 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00989508 A

Priority

  • US 0035366 W
  • US 47368899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0147839A1] The invention is an oligomerization process. A catalyst, a lower olefin, and a process medium are provided. The lower olefin is reacted in the presence of the catalyst to produce a product stream comprising a higher olefin product and a catalyst residue dispoersed in the process medium. The resulting product stream is treated with a quenching material. The quenching material can be an aliphatic primary amine, an aliphatic secondary amine, an alcohol, or a combination of those materials. Amine quenching materials have been found to generate few or no hydrogen halides when used to quench oligomerization catalysts. Alcohol quenching materials can generate hydrogen halides in use. This problem can be alleviated by treating the product stream with a stabilizing material that forms a stable hydrogen halide salt. Exemplary stabilizing materials include aliphatic amines, aromatic amines, and metal salts of amides, butoxides, or carboxylic acids.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 2/06; C07C 2/08; C07C 2/24; C07C 2/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 2/08 (2006.01); C07C 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 2/08 (2013.01); Y02P 20/582 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0147839 A1 20010705; AU 2600601 A 20010709; AU 773364 B2 20040520; CA 2392233 A1 20010705; CA 2392233 C 20061024; CN 1399620 A 20030226; EP 1242341 A1 20020925; EP 1242341 A4 20041103; GC 0000217 A 20060329; MX PA02005399 A 20021205; RU 2002120493 A 20040110; RU 2249585 C2 20050410; ZA 200203457 B 20031029

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081011

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060731

2004-12-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT

2004-11-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040922

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI