Global Patent Index - EP 1242361 A1

EP 1242361 A1 2002-09-25 - PROCESS OF PREPARING TOLTERODINE AND ANALOGUES THERE OF AS WELL AS INTERMEDIATES PREPARED IN THE PROCESS

Title (en)

PROCESS OF PREPARING TOLTERODINE AND ANALOGUES THERE OF AS WELL AS INTERMEDIATES PREPARED IN THE PROCESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON TOLTERODINE UND DEREN ANALOGA SOWIE IM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE ZWISCHENPRODUKTE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PREPARER DE LA TOLTERODINE ET SES ANALOGUES, ET PRODUITS INTERMEDIAIRES PREPARES DANS CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1242361 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00990151 A

Priority

  • SE 0002662 W
  • SE 9904850 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0149649A1] The invention relates to a process for the enantioselective preparation of tolterodine and analogues and salts thereof comprising the steps of: a) enantioselectively reducing the carbonyl function in a compound of formula (II), wherein R>1<, R>2<, and R>3< independently of each other are hydrogen, methyl, methoxy, hydroxy, hydroxymethyl, carbamoyl, sulphamoyl or halogen, to form an enantiomerically enriched compound of formula (IIIa) or (IIIb); b) subjecting the compound of formula (IIIa) or (IIIb) to a sigmatropic rearrangement to form a corresponding enantiomerically enriched compound of formula (IVa) or (IVb); c) subjecting the compound of formula (IVa) or (IVb) to a Baeyer-Villiger oxidation to form a corresponding enantiomerically enriched compound of formula (Va) or (Vb); d) converting the compound of formula (Va) or (Vb) to form the corresponding enantiomerically enriched compound of tolterodine or analogue thereof; and e) optionally converting a compound obtained in base form to a salt thereof, or converting a salt form to the free base. Formulas (IIIa), (IIIb), (IVa), (IVb), (Va) and (Vb) are specified in the application. The invention also relates to novel starting materials and intermediates used in the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 213/02; C07C 35/32; C07C 49/223; C07C 49/67; C07C 49/683; C07C 215/54; C07C 217/62; C07D 311/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 311/14 (2006.01); C07B 53/00 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 29/143 (2006.01); C07C 35/32 (2006.01); C07C 45/51 (2006.01); C07C 45/65 (2006.01); C07C 45/66 (2006.01); C07C 45/74 (2006.01); C07C 49/223 (2006.01); C07C 49/67 (2006.01); C07C 49/683 (2006.01); C07C 49/807 (2006.01); C07C 49/835 (2006.01); C07C 213/00 (2006.01); C07C 213/02 (2006.01); C07C 215/54 (2006.01); C07C 217/62 (2006.01); C07D 311/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 311/20 (2013.01); C07C 29/143 (2013.01); C07C 35/32 (2013.01); C07C 45/512 (2013.01); C07C 45/65 (2013.01); C07C 45/74 (2013.01); C07C 49/835 (2013.01); C07C 213/00 (2013.01); C07C 213/02 (2013.01); C07C 215/54 (2013.01); C07B 2200/07 (2013.01); C07C 2602/08 (2017.05)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 29/143 + C07C 35/32
  2. C07C 45/512 + C07C 49/67
  3. C07C 45/65 + C07C 49/67
  4. C07C 45/74 + C07C 49/813
  5. C07C 213/00 + C07C 215/54
  6. C07C 213/02 + C07C 215/54

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0149649A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0149649 A1 20010712; AR 027138 A1 20030312; AT 282019 T 20041115; AU 2719001 A 20010716; AU 782796 B2 20050901; BR 0016785 A 20020924; CA 2392832 A1 20010712; CN 1209342 C 20050706; CN 1414944 A 20030430; CZ 20022255 A3 20021113; DE 60015799 D1 20041216; DE 60015799 T2 20051215; DK 1242361 T3 20050214; EE 200200325 A 20030815; EP 1242361 A1 20020925; EP 1242361 B1 20041110; EP 1496045 A2 20050112; EP 1496045 A3 20050330; ES 2228658 T3 20050416; HK 1052000 A1 20050930; HU 0203816 A2 20030328; HU 0203816 A3 20041228; IL 150275 D0 20021201; JP 2003519207 A 20030617; MX PA02006415 A 20021129; MY 118906 A 20050228; NO 20023189 A 20020704; NO 20023189 D0 20020701; NZ 519079 A 20040227; PE 11232001 A1 20011109; PL 355947 A1 20040531; PT 1242361 E 20050131; SE 9904850 D0 19991230; SK 9392002 A3 20030109; TW I225476 B 20041221; US 2001016669 A1 20010823; US 6310248 B2 20011030; ZA 200204066 B 20030730

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111223

2013-08-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130823

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60015799

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111222

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101203

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070704

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061222

2008-04-30 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20051222

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PHARMACIA A.B.

- Effective date: 20061231

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061222

2007-11-24 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061222

2007-09-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-08-27 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20061222

2007-08-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2007-07-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2007-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-06-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2006-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061223

2006-12-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061222

2006-01-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-12-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20051128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-25 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051109

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-07 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051107

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051104

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-10-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-09-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-09-26 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2228658 T3

2005-02-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-02-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-12-22 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040403674

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60015799 P 20041216

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-11-10 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20041110

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANDERSSON, PEHR, G.

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEDBERG, CHRISTIAN

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020522;LT PAYMENT 20020522;LV PAYMENT 20020522;MK PAYMENT 20020522;RO PAYMENT 20020522;SI PAYMENT 20020522