Global Patent Index - EP 1242384 A1

EP 1242384 A1 2002-09-25 - PYRAZOLYL BENZYL ETHER DERIVATIVES HAVING A FLUOROMETHOXY GROUP AND THE USE THEREOF AS PESTICIDES

Title (en)

PYRAZOLYL BENZYL ETHER DERIVATIVES HAVING A FLUOROMETHOXY GROUP AND THE USE THEREOF AS PESTICIDES

Title (de)

PYRAZOLYLBENZYLETHERDERIVATE DIE EINE FLUORMETHOXY GRUPPE BESITZEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

DERIVES ETHERS PYRAZOLYLBENZYLIQUES COMPORTANT UN GROUPE FLUOROMETHOXY ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME PARASITICIDE

Publication

EP 1242384 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00985146 A

Priority

  • DE 19961330 A
  • EP 0012322 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19961330A1] 3-Benzyloxy-pyrazole derivatives (I). 3-Benzyloxy-pyrazole derivatives of formula (I) are new: R = (cyclo)alkyl or aryl, all optionally substituted; and L<1>-L<4> = hydrogen, halo, cyano, nitro, or (all optionally substituted by halo) alkyl, alkoxy, alkylthio, alkylsulfinyl or alkylsulfonyl. Independent claims are also included for: (a) method for preparing (I); and (b) composition for controlling harmful organisms comprising (I) plus diluents and/or carriers, optionally also surfactants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 231/22; A01N 43/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/56 (2006.01); C07D 231/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/56 (2013.01); C07D 231/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146153A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19961330 A1 20010621; AU 2165501 A 20010703; EP 1242384 A1 20020925; JP 2003518099 A 20030603; US 6562856 B1 20030513; WO 0146153 A1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040325

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEINEMANN, ULRICH

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GAYER, HERBERT

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GERDES, PETER

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRUEGER, BERND-WIELAND

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAURER, FRITZ

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAUPEL, MARTIN

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAULER-MACHNIK, ASTRID

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WACHENDORFF-NEUMANN, ULRIKE

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI