Global Patent Index - EP 1242387 A1

EP 1242387 A1 2002-09-25 - SUBSTITUTED PHENYLURACILS AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES

Title (en)

SUBSTITUTED PHENYLURACILS AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE PHENYLURACILE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE

Title (fr)

PHENYLURACILES SUBSTITUES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME HERBICIDES

Publication

EP 1242387 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00971405 A

Priority

  • DE 19954312 A
  • EP 0010768 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19954312A1] The invention relates to novel substituted phenyluracils of general formula (I), in which: n = 0, 1 or 2; R1 = H, NH2 or optionally substituted alkyl, R2 = carboxy, cyano, carbamoyl, thiocarbamoyl or optionally substituted alkyl or alkoxycarbonyl; X = hydroxy, mercapto, amino, nitro, cyano, carboxy, carbamoyl, thiocarbamoyl, halogen, or optionally substituted alkyl, alkoxy, alkylthio, alkylsulphinyl, alkylsulphonyl, alkylamino, dialkylamino, alkylcarbonyl, alkoxycarbonyl, alkylaminocarbonyl, dialkylaminocarbonyl, alkylcarbonyloxy, alkoxycarbonyloxy, alkylaminocarbonyloxy, dialkylaminocarbonyloxy, phenylcarbonyloxy, alkylcarbonylamino, alkoxycarbonylamino, alkylsulfonylamino, alkenyl, alkenyloxy, alkenyloxycarbonyl, alkinyl, alkinyloxy or alkinyloxycarbonyl. In the case where n > 1, X, in the individual possible compounds, may have multiple given meanings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 239/54; A01N 43/54; C07C 255/59

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/54 (2006.01); A01N 47/06 (2006.01); A01N 47/22 (2006.01); A01P 13/00 (2006.01); C07C 255/59 (2006.01); C07D 239/54 (2006.01); C07D 239/557 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 239/54 (2013.01); A01N 43/54 (2013.01); A01N 47/06 (2013.01); A01N 47/22 (2013.01); C07C 255/59 (2013.01); C07D 239/557 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0134575A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19954312 A1 20010517; AR 030919 A1 20030903; AU 1027301 A 20010606; AU 778738 B2 20041216; BR 0015483 A 20020716; CA 2390645 A1 20010517; CN 1390208 A 20030108; CO 5221066 A1 20021128; EP 1242387 A1 20020925; JP 2003513960 A 20030415; MX PA02004659 A 20021129; PL 354921 A1 20040322; RU 2002115661 A 20040120; US 6815398 B1 20041109; WO 0134575 A1 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100504

2008-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080611

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDREE, ROLAND

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHWARZ, HANS-GEORG

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DREWES, MARK, WILHELM

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FEUCHT, DIETER

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PONTZEN, ROLF

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WETCHOLOWSKY, INGO

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI