Global Patent Index - EP 1242394 A1

EP 1242394 A1 2002-09-25 - NOVEL 3-OXO-2,1-BENZISOXAZOL-1(3H)-CARBOXAMIDES FOR TREATMENT OF CNS DISEASES

Title (en)

NOVEL 3-OXO-2,1-BENZISOXAZOL-1(3H)-CARBOXAMIDES FOR TREATMENT OF CNS DISEASES

Title (de)

NEUE 3-OXO-2,1-BENZISOXAZOL-1(3H)-CARBOXAMIDE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZNS-ERKRANKUNGEN

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX 3-OXO-2,1-BENZISOXAZOL-1(3H)-CARBOXAMIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL

Publication

EP 1242394 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00983231 A

Priority

  • DE 19960917 A
  • EP 0012268 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144211A1] The invention relates to novel 3-oxo-2,1-benzisoxazol-1(3H)-carboxamides (I), where R<1>, R<2> are the same or different and independently = H, halogen, C1 C6 alkyl, C1 C6 alkoxy, C1 C3 perfluoroalkyl, or a group NR<5>R<6>; R<3>, R<4> are the same or different and independently = C1 C8 alkyl, whose carbon chain is optionally interrupted by an O, S or NR<7> and is optionally singly or severally substituted by C3 C6 cycloalkyl, C1 C4 alkoxy, OH, halogen or NR<8>R<9>; C3 C8 cycloalkyl whose carbon chain is optionally interrupted by an O, S or NR<10> and is optionally singly or severally substituted by C1 C4 alkoxy, OH, halogen or NR<11>R<12>; or R<3> and R<4> together with a nitrogen atom form a saturated or partially unsaturated 3- to 10-membered mono- or bi-cyclic heterocycle, which, optionally, contains up to two further heteroatoms, from N, O or S and is, optionally, substituted by C1 C4 alkyl, C1 C4 alkoxy, OH, halogen, COOR<13> or NR<14>R<15>and X = O or S. The invention further relates to methods for production thereof and use thereof in the production of medicaments for the prophylaxis and/or treatment of diseases of the central nervous system, in particular, cognitive disorders, such as Alzheimer's disease and other forms of dementia, cerebral infarct, skull and brain trauma and pain.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 261/20; A61K 31/423; A61P 25/04; A61P 25/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/423 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07D 261/20 (2006.01); C07D 413/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 261/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144211A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144211 A1 20010621; AU 2005501 A 20010625; CA 2395167 A1 20010621; DE 19960917 A1 20010621; EP 1242394 A1 20020925; JP 2003516976 A 20030520; US 6589949 B1 20030708

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-05 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080917

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE AG

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORIWAKI, TOSHIYA

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUERSTNER, CHANTAL

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RIEDL, BERND

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ERGUEDEN, JENS-KERIM

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOESS, FRANK-GERHARD

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, BERNARD

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN DER STAAY, FRANZ-JOSEF

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHROEDER, WERNER

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI