Global Patent Index - EP 1242398 A2

EP 1242398 A2 2002-09-25 - PARTIALLY SATURATED CALCIUM CHANNEL BLOCKERS

Title (en)

PARTIALLY SATURATED CALCIUM CHANNEL BLOCKERS

Title (de)

TEILWEISE GESÄTTIGTE CALCIUMKANAL-BLOCKER

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS CALCIQUES PARTIELLEMENT SATURES

Publication

EP 1242398 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00988532 A

Priority

  • CA 0001558 W
  • US 17276599 P
  • US 47692999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146166A2] Compounds of formula (1a) or (1b) or the salts thereof, wherein each Z is independently N or CH, but one Z must be N; wherein n<1> is 1 and n<2> is 0 or 1; X<1> and X<2> are linkers; Ar represents one or two substituted or unsubstituted aromatic or heteroaromatic rings, and Cy represents one or two substituted or unsubstituted aliphatic cyclic or heterocyclic rings, or consists of one substituted or unsubstituted aliphatic cyclic or heterocyclic ring and one substituted or unsubstituted aromatic or heteroaromatic ring; each of Ya and Yb is two substituted or unsubstituted aromatic or heteroaromatic rings, or can be two substituted or unsubstituted aliphatic cyclic or heterocyclic rings or consists of one substituted or unsubstituted aliphatic cyclic or heterocyclic ring and one substituted or unsubstituted aromatic or heteroaromatic ring; with the proviso that said rings cannot both be phenyl when both Ar includes a single phenyl ring and X<1> contains less than 5C; and with the proviso that formula (1b) must contain at least one aromatic or heteroaromatic ring; 1<1> is 0 or 1; R<1> is substituted or unsubstituted alkyl (1-6C), substituted or unsubstituted aryl (6-10C) or substituted or unsubstituted arylalkyl (7-16C) optionally containing 1-4 heteroatoms selected from the group consisting of halo, N, P, O, and S or may independently be halo, OR, SR, NR2, OOCR, NROCR, COR, COOR, CONR2, CF3, CN or NO2, wherein R is H or alkyl (1-6C).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 295/02; A61K 31/445; A61K 31/495; A61P 9/00; A61P 25/00; C07D 211/32; C07D 211/58; C07D 295/06; C07D 295/18; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/22 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); C07D 295/02 (2006.01); C07D 295/073 (2006.01); C07D 295/18 (2006.01); C07D 295/185 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/185 (2013.01); C07D 295/073 (2013.01); C40B 40/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146166A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146166 A2 20010628; WO 0146166 A3 20020307; AU 2495701 A 20010703; AU 784848 B2 20060706; CA 2397681 A1 20010628; CA 2397681 C 20110315; EP 1242398 A2 20020925; JP 2003518107 A 20030603; MX PA02006137 A 20021205; NO 20022948 A 20020819; NO 20022948 D0 20020619; NO 326939 B1 20090316

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140701

2011-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZALICUS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040712

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI