Global Patent Index - EP 1242414 A1

EP 1242414 A1 2002-09-25 - PYRAZOLYL BENZYL ETHERS

Title (en)

PYRAZOLYL BENZYL ETHERS

Title (de)

PYRAZOLYLBENZYLETHER

Title (fr)

BENZYLETHERS DE PYRAZOLYLE

Publication

EP 1242414 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00979643 A

Priority

  • DE 19959948 A
  • DE 10035855 A
  • EP 0011988 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144238A1] The invention relates to novel pyrazolyl benzyl ethers of general formula (I), a method for producing the same and the use thereof for combating harmful organisms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 413/12; A01N 43/56; A01N 43/88; C07D 231/20; C07D 273/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/88 (2006.01); A61K 31/539 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 33/14 (2006.01); C07D 273/01 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/88 (2013.01); C07D 413/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144238A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144238 A1 20010621; AU 1706001 A 20010625; EP 1242414 A1 20020925; JP 2003526635 A 20030909; US 2003109702 A1 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030820

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEINEMANN, ULRICH

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRUEGER, BERND-WIELAND

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GAYER, HERBERT

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GERDES, PETER

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAURER, FRITZ

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAUPEL, MARTIN

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAULER-MACHNIK, ASTRID

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WACHENDORFF-NEUMANN, ULRIKE

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020715

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI