Global Patent Index - EP 1242441 A2

EP 1242441 A2 2002-09-25 - POLYNUCLEOTIDE VACCINES EXPRESSING CODON OPTIMIZED HIV-1 NEF AND MODIFIED HIV-1 NEF

Title (en)

POLYNUCLEOTIDE VACCINES EXPRESSING CODON OPTIMIZED HIV-1 NEF AND MODIFIED HIV-1 NEF

Title (de)

KODON OPTIMIERTE HIV-1 NEF UND MODIFIZIERTES HIV-1 NEF EXPRIMIERENDE POLYNUCLEOTIDIMPFSTOFFE

Title (fr)

VACCINS POLYNUCLEOTIDIQUES EXPRIMANT LA PROTEINE NEF DE VIH-1 OPTIMISEE PAR CODONS ET PROTEINE NEF DE VIH-1 MODIFIEE

Publication

EP 1242441 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00989282 A

Priority

  • US 0034162 W
  • US 17244299 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143693A2] Pharmaceutical compositions which comprise HIV Nef DNA vaccines are disclosed, along with the production and use of these DNA vaccines. The nef-based DNA vaccines of the invention are administered directly introduced into living vertebrate tissue, preferably humans, and express the HIV Nef protein or biologically relevant portions thereof, inducing a cellular immune response which specifically recognizes human immunodeficiency virus-1 (HIV-1). The DNA molecules which comprise the open reading frame of these DNA vaccines are synthetic DNA molecules encoding codon optimized HIV-1 Nef and derivatives of optimized HIV-1 Nef, including nef modifications comprising amino terminal leader peptides, removal of the amino terminal myristylation site, and/or modification of the Nef dileucine motif. These modifications may effect wild type characteristics of Nef, such as myristylation and down regulation of host CD4.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; A61K 39/00; A61K 39/39; A61K 48/00; A61P 31/18; C07K 14/16; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); C07K 14/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); A61K 2039/53 (2013.01); A61K 2039/55511 (2013.01); A61K 2039/57 (2013.01); C12N 2740/16322 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143693 A2 20010621; WO 0143693 A3 20020221; AU 2581001 A 20010625; AU 782193 B2 20050707; CA 2393861 A1 20010621; EP 1242441 A2 20020925; EP 1242441 A4 20040414; JP 2003516741 A 20030520

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080304

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051110

2004-04-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040226

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 A

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/00 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/00 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/39 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 31/18 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/09 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/16 B

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI