Global Patent Index - EP 1242443 A1

EP 1242443 A1 2002-09-25 - NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES

Title (en)

NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES

Title (de)

NEUE NUKLEINSÄUREN UND POLYPEPTIDE

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET POLYPEPTIDES

Publication

EP 1242443 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00990231 A

Priority

  • US 0034263 W
  • US 47127599 A
  • US 48872500 A
  • US 55231700 A
  • US 59804200 A
  • US 62031200 A
  • US 65345000 A
  • US 66219100 A
  • US 69303600 A
  • US 72734400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0153312A1] The present invention provides novel nucleic acids, novel polypeptide sequences encoded by these nucleic acids and uses thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/435; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/775 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C07K 14/705 (2013.01); C07K 14/775 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0153312 A1 20010726; WO 0153312 A8 20011101; WO 0153312 A8 20020620; CA 2402563 A1 20010726; EP 1242443 A1 20020925; EP 1242443 A4 20050622

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060111

2005-06-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 A

2005-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/11 B

2005-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2005-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/70 B

2005-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/00 B

2005-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/435 B

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO, INC.

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO INC.

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI