Global Patent Index - EP 1242461 A2

EP 1242461 A2 2002-09-25 - METHOD OF INCREASING THE ALPHA-AMYLASE-RESISTANT STARCH CONTENT (RS CONTENT) OF A POLYSACCHARIDE, POLYSACCHARIDES, THE USE THEREOF AND FOOD CONTAINING SAID POLYSACCHARIDES

Title (en)

METHOD OF INCREASING THE ALPHA-AMYLASE-RESISTANT STARCH CONTENT (RS CONTENT) OF A POLYSACCHARIDE, POLYSACCHARIDES, THE USE THEREOF AND FOOD CONTAINING SAID POLYSACCHARIDES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES GEHALTES AN ALPHA AMYLASE-RESISTENTER STÄRKE(RS-GEHALT) EINES POLYSACCHARIDS, POLYSACCHARIDE, DEREN VERWENDUNG UND LEBENSMITTEL MIT DIESEN POLYSACCHARIDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR AUGMENTER LA TENEUR EN AMIDON RESISTANT A L'ALPHA-AMYLASE (TENEUR EN AMIDON RESISTANT) D'UN POLYSACCHARIDE, POLYSACCHARIDES, LEUR UTILISATION, ET PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES CONTENANT CES POLYSACCHARIDES

Publication

EP 1242461 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00981358 A

Priority

  • DE 19959863 A
  • EP 0012459 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142309A2] The invention relates to a method of increasing the alpha -amylase-resistant starch content (RS content) of a polysaccharide. The inventive method is characterized by incubating the polysaccharide used with less than an equivalent weight of water, cooling it, optionally drying it and obtaining a polysaccharide that has an increased RS content vis-à-vis the polysaccharide used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 1/308 (2006.01); C08B 30/12 (2006.01); C08B 37/00 (2006.01); C12P 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08B 30/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142309A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142309 A2 20010614; WO 0142309 A3 20020214; WO 0142309 A8 20010712; AU 1862901 A 20010618; AU 784300 B2 20060309; DE 19959863 A1 20010613; EP 1242461 A2 20020925; JP 2003516433 A 20030513; US 2003094172 A1 20030522; US 6929815 B2 20050816

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141203

2007-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUEDZUCKER AG MANNHEIM/OCHSENFURT

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060807

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR