Global Patent Index - EP 1242562 A1

EP 1242562 A1 2002-09-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXHAUSTING THE CHARGING GASES WHICH RESULT ON CHARGING A VERTICAL FLUE OVEN

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXHAUSTING THE CHARGING GASES WHICH RESULT ON CHARGING A VERTICAL FLUE OVEN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABSAUGEN VON FÜLLGASEN, DIE BEIM BEFÜLLEN EINES HORIZONTALKAMMEROFENS ANFALLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION DE GAZ DE CHARGEMENT SURVENANT LORS DU CHARGEMENT D'UN FOUR A CREUSET HORIZONTAL

Publication

EP 1242562 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00988710 A

Priority

  • DE 19963951 A
  • EP 0011353 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0149807A1] The invention relates to a method for exhausting the charging gases produced on charging a vertical flue oven. The charging gases are exhausted during the filling of a chamber, by means of a riser tube (1), connected to said chamber and fed to a gas collecting main, which is fed with crude gas, produced during the coking of charge coal. The filling gases are, additionally, exhausted through the coal charging holes (2), in the oven roof, during the charging of coal and fed to the riser tube (1') of a neighbouring chamber, from whence said gases also reach the gas collector main. The invention further relates to a device for carrying out the method disclosed above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 27/04; C10B 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10B 27/04 (2006.01); C10B 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 27/04 (2013.01); C10B 31/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0149807A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0149807 A1 20010712; AT 305498 T 20051015; BR 0016315 A 20020827; BR 0016315 B1 20110503; CA 2391506 A1 20010712; CA 2391506 C 20080115; DE 19963951 A1 20010719; DE 19963951 C2 20020207; DE 50011264 D1 20060209; EP 1242562 A1 20020925; EP 1242562 B1 20050928; ES 2249324 T3 20060401

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [REG BE MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171130

2018-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171116

2018-08-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180731

2018-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171116

2018-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 305498 T

- Effective date: 20171116

2018-07-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011264

2017-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141116

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 50011264

2015-11-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011264

- Representative's name: ALBRECHT, RAINER, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141116

2015-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150604

2015-08-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141117

2015-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150518

2015-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141116

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-29 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20050403550

- Effective date: 20150604

2015-06-30 [REG SE EUG] EP PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141116

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-05-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150518

2014-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20131119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-02-28 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130517

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP UHDE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 50011264

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 50011264

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011264

- Representative's name: ALBRECHT, RAINER, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-06-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011264

- Representative's name: RAINER ALBRECHT, DE

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2249324 T3

2006-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011264 P 20060209

2006-01-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-12-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-12-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050403550

2005-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2005-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-16 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-10-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-09-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UHDE GMBH

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031006

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR