Global Patent Index - EP 1242569 A1

EP 1242569 A1 2002-09-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CATALYTIC CRACKING COMPRISING IN PARALLEL AT LEAST AN UPFLOW REACTOR AND AT LEAST A DOWNFLOW REACTOR

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CATALYTIC CRACKING COMPRISING IN PARALLEL AT LEAST AN UPFLOW REACTOR AND AT LEAST A DOWNFLOW REACTOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KATALYTISCHEN SPALTUNG MIT AUFWÄRTS- UND ABWÄRTSBETRIEBENEN PARALLELEN REAKTOREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CRAQUAGE CATALYTIQUE COMPRENANT EN PARALLELE AU MOINS UN REACTEUR A ECOULEMENT ASCENDANT ET AU MOINS UN REACTEUR A ECOULEMENT DESCENDANT

Publication

EP 1242569 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00983393 A

Priority

  • FR 0003315 W
  • FR 9915747 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144409A1] The invention concerns a device and a method for catalytic cracking of a hydrocarbon feedstock in at least two reaction zones, one (30) having an upflow of catalyst, wherein the feedstock and the catalyst derived from the regeneration zone (3) is circulated, the first gases produced are separated from the coked catalyst in a first separating zone (38), the catalyst is stripped (40), a first cracking and stripping effluent (42) is recuperated and the coked catalyst (45) is recycled in the regenerating zone. The catalyst (12) coming from the regeneration zone (3) and a hydrocarbon feedstock (19) are introduced in the top part of a downflow reaction zone (16), wherein the catalyst and the feedstock are circulated from the top downwards, the coked catalyst is separated from the second gases produced in a second separating zone (20), the second gases produced (24) are recuperated and the coked catalyst is recycled (25) in the regeneration zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 51/06; C10G 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/18 (2006.01); C10G 51/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 51/06 (2013.01); C10G 11/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144409A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144409 A1 20010621; AT 497527 T 20110215; DE 60045600 D1 20110317; EP 1242569 A1 20020925; EP 1242569 B1 20110202; ES 2359623 T3 20110525; FR 2802211 A1 20010615; FR 2802211 B1 20020201; JP 2003517088 A 20030520; JP 4671089 B2 20110413; MX PA02005794 A 20030128; US 7220351 B1 20070522; ZA 200204751 B 20030613

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110202

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111128

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-03-01 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60045600

- Effective date: 20111103

2012-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111103

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110202

2011-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110202

2011-08-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110202

2011-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110202

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110602

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON, HAUTS-DE-SEINE, FR

- Document: DE 60045600

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-05-25 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2359623 T3

- Effective date: 20110525

2011-05-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-05-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20110400656

- Effective date: 20110412

2011-04-20 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-03-17 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60045600

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60045600 P 20110317

2011-03-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2011-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2011-02-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050329

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020715

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI